This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/10/2021 at 16:25:46 (UTC).

LAURENE DUKE MONTGOMERY, DDS vs GLEN IVY HOT SPRINGS

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 LAURENE DUKE MONTGOMERY, DDS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GLEN IVY HOT SPRINGS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel Ottolia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0920

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Daniel Ottolia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAURENE DUKE MONTGOMERY, DDS

Defendant

GLEN IVY HOT SPRINGS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Evan T. Burge

Defendant Attorney

Danielle D Mittskus

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing

08/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

08/24/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Case Management Statement

08/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENE DUKE MONTGOMERY, DDS

07/21/2021: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENE DUKE MONTGOMERY, DDS

Plaintiff Laurene Duke Montgomery, DDS' Notice of Posting Jury Fees on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENE DUKE MONTGOMERY, DDS

07/01/2021: Plaintiff Laurene Duke Montgomery, DDS' Notice of Posting Jury Fees on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENE DUKE MONTGOMERY, DDS

Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENE DUKE MONTGOMERY, DDS

04/09/2021: Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENE DUKE MONTGOMERY, DDS

Notice of Posting Jury Fees on Behalf of Defendant, Glen Ivy Hot Springs

04/09/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees on Behalf of Defendant, Glen Ivy Hot Springs

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENE DUKE MONTGOMERY, DDS

04/01/2021: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENE DUKE MONTGOMERY, DDS

Notice of Case Management Conference

03/01/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

03/01/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

02/19/2021: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

02/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

02/19/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

02/19/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement; Filed By: GLEN IVY HOT SPRINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENE DUKE MONTGOMERY, DDS; Filed By: LAURENE DUKE MONTGOMERY, DDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/01/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210701-00084.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff Laurene Duke Montgomery, DDS' Notice of Posting Jury Fees on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENE DUKE MONTGOMERY, DDS; Filed By: LAURENE DUKE MONTGOMERY, DDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/22/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1752 Receipt No.: 20210422-00439.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENE DUKE MONTGOMERY, DDS; Filed By: GLEN IVY HOT SPRINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENE DUKE MONTGOMERY, DDS; Filed By: LAURENE DUKE MONTGOMERY, DDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/01/2021; Fine Description: Check #D3815624 Receipt No.: 20210301-00164.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: LAURENE DUKE MONTGOMERY, DDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: LAURENE DUKE MONTGOMERY, DDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: LAURENE DUKE MONTGOMERY, DDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: LAURENE DUKE MONTGOMERY, DDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENE DUKE MONTGOMERY, DDS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLEN IVY HOT SPRINGS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MITTSKUS DANIELLE