This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/31/2021 at 09:34:39 (UTC).

LARZELERE vs CRST LINCOLN SALES, INC

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 LARZELERE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CRST LINCOLN SALES, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Craig Riemer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0241

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Craig Riemer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DYLAN CHARLES LARZELERE

NICHOLAS RAYMOND LARZELERE

Defendants

WILLIAM CHARLES HOWARD

CRST-EXPEDITED INC

DERRICK D SHIPP

CRST LINCOLN SALES, INC

CRST EXPEDITED, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Parham Nikfarjam

Defendant Attorney

Richard B. Canada

 

Court Documents

Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

10/25/2021: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

Certificate of Mailing

10/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Trial Setting Order

10/25/2021: Trial Setting Order

Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of NICHOLAS RAYMOND LARZELERE

02/24/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of NICHOLAS RAYMOND LARZELERE

Request for Dismissal

05/03/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

05/03/2021: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of NICHOLAS RAYMOND LARZELERE

10/06/2021: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of NICHOLAS RAYMOND LARZELERE

Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of NICHOLAS RAYMOND LARZELERE

10/06/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of NICHOLAS RAYMOND LARZELERE

Case Management Statement

10/06/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of NICHOLAS RAYMOND LARZELERE

10/12/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of NICHOLAS RAYMOND LARZELERE

Certificate of Mailing

07/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

07/27/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of NICHOLAS RAYMOND LARZELERE

07/13/2021: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of NICHOLAS RAYMOND LARZELERE

Case Management Statement

07/13/2021: Case Management Statement

Stipulation Regarding Defendant CRST Expedited, INC's Admission of Negligence and Vicarious Liability

05/19/2021: Stipulation Regarding Defendant CRST Expedited, INC's Admission of Negligence and Vicarious Liability

Request for Dismissal

05/03/2021: Request for Dismissal

Demand for Jury Trial by Defendants CRST Lincoln Sales, Inc., CRST Expedited, Inc. (erroneously sued as CRST-Expedited Inc.), William Charles Howard, and Derrick D. Shipp

04/12/2021: Demand for Jury Trial by Defendants CRST Lincoln Sales, Inc., CRST Expedited, Inc. (erroneously sued as CRST-Expedited Inc.), William Charles Howard, and Derrick D. Shipp

Answer of Defendants CRST Lincoln Sales, Inc., CRST Expedited, Inc. (erroenously sued as CRST-Expedited Inc.), William Charles Howard, and Derrick D. Shipp to Plaintiffs' Unverified Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of NICHOLAS RAYMOND L

04/12/2021: Answer of Defendants CRST Lincoln Sales, Inc., CRST Expedited, Inc. (erroenously sued as CRST-Expedited Inc.), William Charles Howard, and Derrick D. Shipp to Plaintiffs' Unverified Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of NICHOLAS RAYMOND LARZELERE

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • HearingType: Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • HearingType: Trial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Trial Setting Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of NICHOLAS RAYMOND LARZELERE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/08/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *4190 Receipt No.: 20211008-00154.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/07/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20211007-00176.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of NICHOLAS RAYMOND LARZELERE; Filed By: CRST EXPEDITED, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/29/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *4190 Receipt No.: 20210129-00156.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/29/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *4190 Receipt No.: 20210129-00156.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: NICHOLAS RAYMOND LARZELERE; DYLAN CHARLES LARZELERE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: NICHOLAS RAYMOND LARZELERE; DYLAN CHARLES LARZELERE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: NICHOLAS RAYMOND LARZELERE; DYLAN CHARLES LARZELERE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000); Filed By: NICHOLAS RAYMOND LARZELERE; DYLAN CHARLES LARZELERE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Posting Jury Fees.; Filed By: NICHOLAS RAYMOND LARZELERE; DYLAN CHARLES LARZELERE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of NICHOLAS RAYMOND LARZELERE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CRST LINCOLN SALES INC. AN IOWA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CRST Expedited, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CANADA RICHARD BRENT