This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/28/2022 at 00:23:05 (UTC).

LARSON vs RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P.

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 LARSON filed an Other lawsuit against RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L P. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2009

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIANA LARSON

Defendants

RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

COLUMBIA RIVERSIDE, INC

HCA HEALTHCARE, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEPHEN MICHAEL GARCIA

Defendant Attorney

CRAIG S DUMMIT

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Damages

05/19/2022: Complaint for Damages

Summons Issued and Filed

05/19/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration of Tina Puls as Successor in Interest to Diana Larson Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 377.32

05/19/2022: Declaration of Tina Puls as Successor in Interest to Diana Larson Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 377.32

Certificate of Counsel.

05/19/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000)

05/19/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

05/19/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000) of DIANA LARSON

05/26/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000) of DIANA LARSON

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000) of DIANA LARSON

05/26/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000) of DIANA LARSON

Defendant Riverside Community Hospital Erroneously Sued Herein as Riverside Healthcare System LP and Columbia Riverside Inc's Answer on Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000) of DIANA LARSON

06/14/2022: Defendant Riverside Community Hospital Erroneously Sued Herein as Riverside Healthcare System LP and Columbia Riverside Inc's Answer on Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000) of DIANA LARSON

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/14/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220614-01460.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/14/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220614-01460.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/14/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220614-01460.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendant Riverside Community Hospital Erroneously Sued Herein as Riverside Healthcare System LP and Columbia Riverside Inc's Answer on Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000) of DIANA LARSON; Filed By: RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL; COLUMBIA RIVERSIDE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/27/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220527-00478.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000) of DIANA LARSON; Filed By: DIANA LARSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000) of DIANA LARSON; Filed By: DIANA LARSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/19/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220519-01706.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/19/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220519-01706.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 07/18/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: DIANA LARSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Tina Puls as Successor in Interest to Diana Larson Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 377.32; Filed By: DIANA LARSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: DIANA LARSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: DIANA LARSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Damages; Filed By: DIANA LARSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000) of DIANA LARSON

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLUMBIA RIVERSIDEINC is a litigant

Latest cases where RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where HCA, INC., A FOREIGN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUMMIT CRAIG S