This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/26/2023 at 00:31:07 (UTC).

KLOECKNER METALS CORPORATION vs PARAGON TACTICAL INC.

Case Summary

On 01/20/2023 KLOECKNER METALS CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PARAGON TACTICAL INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carol A. Greene. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0312

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carol A. Greene

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KLOECKNER METALS CORPORATION

Defendants

PARAGON TACTICAL INC

ARTHUR FRANSEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIMOTHY CARL AIRES

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Breach of Promissory Note; Open Book Account; Account Stated; Quantum Valebant

01/20/2023: Complaint for Breach of Promissory Note; Open Book Account; Account Stated; Quantum Valebant

Certificate of Counsel.

01/20/2023: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/20/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

01/20/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Contract (Over $25,000)

01/25/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Contract (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

01/25/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/25/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230125-01049.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/25/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230125-01049.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Contract (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 03/21/2023; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: KLOECKNER METALS CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: KLOECKNER METALS CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: KLOECKNER METALS CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Breach of Promissory Note; Open Book Account; Account Stated; Quantum Valebant; Filed By: KLOECKNER METALS CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Contract (Over $25,000) of KLOECKNER METALS CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less