Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/30/2021 at 04:56:05 (UTC).

KITTELL vs SCHWARTZ

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 KITTELL filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SCHWARTZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kira L. Klatchko. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2361

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kira L. Klatchko

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES S. KITTELL, II

Defendants

CECIL JOHN ROLLS

CECIL ROLLS

JOHN ROLLS

ALAN J. SCHWARTZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Randy Chang

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing

07/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

07/13/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted by Clerk

07/06/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted by Clerk

Proof of Service by Mail re: WRITTEN RESPONSE

07/06/2021: Proof of Service by Mail re: WRITTEN RESPONSE

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of JAMES S. KITTELL, II

07/06/2021: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of JAMES S. KITTELL, II

Notice of Document Return.

06/29/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Case Management Conference

05/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

05/14/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Summons Issued and Filed

05/13/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

05/13/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

05/13/2021: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/06/2021; Fine Description: Fee waiver Receipt No.: 20210706-00481.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/06/2021; Fine Description: Fee waiver Receipt No.: 20210706-00481.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted by Clerk; Filed By: CECIL JOHN ROLLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001); Filed By: CECIL JOHN ROLLS; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted by Clerk; Filed By: ALAN J. SCHWARTZ

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of JAMES S. KITTELL, II; Filed By: ALAN J. SCHWARTZ; CECIL JOHN ROLLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/14/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *0039 Receipt No.: 20210514-00351.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: JAMES S. KITTELL, II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: JAMES S. KITTELL, II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: JAMES S. KITTELL, II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000); Filed By: JAMES S. KITTELL, II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of JAMES S. KITTELL, II

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANG RANDY