This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/08/2022 at 00:26:31 (UTC).

KIRKALDY vs AMAZON.COM, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/01/2022 KIRKALDY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AMAZON COM, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0836

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SABRINA LEE KIRKALDY

Defendants

AMAZON.COM, INC

AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSEPH S FARZAM

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Damages

03/01/2022: Complaint for Damages

Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/01/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

03/01/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

03/01/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

03/07/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

03/07/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/07/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220307-00312.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/07/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220307-00312.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 04/30/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: SABRINA LEE KIRKALDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: SABRINA LEE KIRKALDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: SABRINA LEE KIRKALDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Damages; Filed By: SABRINA LEE KIRKALDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of AMAZON.COM, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FARZAM, JOSEPH S