This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/04/2021 at 13:16:53 (UTC).

KING vs KING

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 KING filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against KING. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kira L. Klatchko. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2614

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kira L. Klatchko

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAUL KING

Defendants

CHARLES KIELEY

MICHAEL KING

LAURI KIBBY

Nominal Defendant

KINGS GARDEN, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Belinda Martinez Vega

ARYEH L. KAUFMAN

ARYEH KAUFMAN

Defendant Attorney

Julie Z Kimball

Nominal Defendant Attorney

Edward Allan Klein

 

Court Documents

Notice of Document Return.

11/01/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

11/01/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

11/01/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of PAUL KING

11/02/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of PAUL KING

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of PAUL KING

11/03/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of PAUL KING

Notice of Document Return.

10/25/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

10/25/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

10/14/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set One and for Sanctions Answer/Response to Production of Documents, Request for Production, Set One on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of PAUL KING

10/13/2021: Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set One and for Sanctions Answer/Response to Production of Documents, Request for Production, Set One on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of PAUL KING

Consolidated Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Compliance and Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set One, and for Sanctions; and Declaration of Eric J. Lorenzini in Sup on Complaint for Fraud (

10/13/2021: Consolidated Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Compliance and Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set One, and for Sanctions; and Declaration of Eric J. Lorenzini in Sup on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of PAUL KING

Separate Statement in Support of Defendant Michael King's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production, Set One, and For Sanctions on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of PAUL KING

10/13/2021: Separate Statement in Support of Defendant Michael King's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production, Set One, and For Sanctions on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of PAUL KING

Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Compliance with Agreement to Produce Documents in Response to Request for Production, Set One, and for Sanctions Answer/Response to Production of Documents, Production of Documents, Request for Production of Docu

10/13/2021: Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Compliance with Agreement to Produce Documents in Response to Request for Production, Set One, and for Sanctions Answer/Response to Production of Documents, Production of Documents, Request for Production of Documents, Set One, Request for Production of Documents, Set One on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of PAUL KING

Consolidated Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motions to Copel Compliance and Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set One, and for Sanctions; and Declaration of Eric J. Lorenzini in Sup on Complaint for Fraud (

10/13/2021: Consolidated Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motions to Copel Compliance and Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set One, and for Sanctions; and Declaration of Eric J. Lorenzini in Sup on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of PAUL KING

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of PAUL KING

06/21/2021: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of PAUL KING

Certificate of Mailing

09/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Defendants Michael King Lauri Kibby and Charles Kieleys Corrected Reply in Support if Demurrers to Plaintiffs Complaint

09/01/2021: Defendants Michael King Lauri Kibby and Charles Kieleys Corrected Reply in Support if Demurrers to Plaintiffs Complaint

Certificate of Mailing

09/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

09/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion to Compel; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion to Compel: Answer/Response to Production of Documents Request for Production of Documents, Set One, Production of Documents Request for Production of Documents, Set One by MICHAEL KING; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion to Compel: Answer/Response to Production of Documents Request for Production, Set One by MICHAEL KING; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of PAUL KING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of PAUL KING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • HearingType: Ex Parte Hearing re: for Order Dismissing Entire Action; Memo of P&As; Declaration of Eric J. Lorenzini; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Taken off calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion to Compel; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Taken off calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of PAUL KING; Filed By: PAUL KING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/28/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *3662 Receipt No.: 20210528-00395.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PAUL KING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: PAUL KING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: PAUL KING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000); Filed By: PAUL KING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of PAUL KING

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kings Garden Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLEIN EDWARD ALLAN