This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/17/2023 at 18:32:30 (UTC).

KHAN vs RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/16/2022 KHAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE WELLNESS CENTRE, LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel Ottolia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0647

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Daniel Ottolia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LATIFA KHAN

Defendants

RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE, LLC

ALTA VISTA HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE

CITRUS WELLNESS CENTER, LLC

ENSEMBLE HEALTHCARE LLC

PACIFIC REHABILITATION & WELLNESS CENTER, LP

PACIFIC WELLNESS GP, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAWN SMITH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f)

02/27/2023: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f)

Certificate of Mailing

02/27/2023: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

02/27/2023: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LATIFA KHAN

02/14/2023: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LATIFA KHAN

Notice of Remote Appearance for Hearing on Throughout the case on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LATIFA KHAN

02/14/2023: Notice of Remote Appearance for Hearing on Throughout the case on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LATIFA KHAN

Case Management Statement Untimely on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LATIFA KHAN

02/14/2023: Case Management Statement Untimely on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LATIFA KHAN

Notice of Department Assignment

12/02/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/02/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order: Ex Parte Hearing re: Plaintiff's Notice of Hearing and Motion to Vacate Dismissal without Prejudice and Reinstate Plaintiff's Complaint by LATIFA KHAN

11/28/2022: Minute Order: Ex Parte Hearing re: Plaintiff's Notice of Hearing and Motion to Vacate Dismissal without Prejudice and Reinstate Plaintiff's Complaint by LATIFA KHAN

Notice of Ruling re: Motion to Vacate Order of Dismissal on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LATIFA KHAN

11/28/2022: Notice of Ruling re: Motion to Vacate Order of Dismissal on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LATIFA KHAN

Declaration of Dawn Smith in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Dismissal Without Prejudice & Reinstate Plaintiff's Complaint as to all Parties and Ex Parte Application

11/23/2022: Declaration of Dawn Smith in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Dismissal Without Prejudice & Reinstate Plaintiff's Complaint as to all Parties and Ex Parte Application

Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Ex parte Hearing on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LATIFA KHAN

11/23/2022: Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Ex parte Hearing on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LATIFA KHAN

Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Dismissal Without Prejudice and Reinstate Complaint as to All Parties

11/28/2022: Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Dismissal Without Prejudice and Reinstate Complaint as to All Parties

Minute Order: Ex Parte Hearing re: Plaintiff's Notice of Hearing and Motion to Vacate Dismissal without Prejudice and Reinstate Plaintiff's Complaint by LATIFA KHAN

11/23/2022: Minute Order: Ex Parte Hearing re: Plaintiff's Notice of Hearing and Motion to Vacate Dismissal without Prejudice and Reinstate Plaintiff's Complaint by LATIFA KHAN

Notice of Hearing (eFiling) on Ex Parte Application re: on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LATIFA KHAN

11/22/2022: Notice of Hearing (eFiling) on Ex Parte Application re: on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LATIFA KHAN

Ex Parte Application re: Plaintiff's Notice of Hearing and Motion to Vacate Dismissal without Prejudice and Reinstate Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LATIFA KHAN

11/22/2022: Ex Parte Application re: Plaintiff's Notice of Hearing and Motion to Vacate Dismissal without Prejudice and Reinstate Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LATIFA KHAN

Notice of Document Return.

11/22/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

11/22/2022: Notice of Document Return.

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f) as to DAWN SMITH, LATIFA KHAN; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • FinancialCOLLECTION HISTORY; Debtor Number: 2283900; Debt Type: FEE; Collection Status: ECD; Total Amount Assessed: $450.00; Original Delinquent Amount: $450.00; Current Balance: $450.00; Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Debt Type: Fee; Due Date: 02/16/2023; Total Amount Assessed: $450.00; Original Delinquent Amount: $450.00; Current Balance: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • FinancialCOLLECTION HISTORY; Debtor Number: 2283741; Debt Type: FEE; Collection Status: ECD; Total Amount Assessed: $450.00; Original Delinquent Amount: $450.00; Current Balance: $450.00; Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Debt Type: Fee; Due Date: 02/15/2023; Total Amount Assessed: $450.00; Original Delinquent Amount: $450.00; Current Balance: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/15/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230215-01861.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendant's Notice of Filing of the Notice of Removal of this Action to the U.S. District Court for the Central District of California on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LATIFA KHAN; Filed By: RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE, LLC; PACIFIC WELLNESS GP, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LATIFA KHAN; Filed By: LATIFA KHAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LATIFA KHAN; Filed By: LATIFA KHAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint; Filed By: LATIFA KHAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: LATIFA KHAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: LATIFA KHAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: LATIFA KHAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LATIFA KHAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less