This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/11/2022 at 06:17:12 (UTC).

KELCE vs KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 KELCE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5768

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAWN L. KELCE

Defendants

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC

JOSHUA SIMPSON

GREG SZUSZKA

MICHELLE HUMPHREYS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARNEY RICHARD SHEGERIAN Mahru Madjidi

 

Court Documents

Notice of Department Assignment

12/23/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

12/23/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

12/22/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

12/22/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Plaintiff Shawn L. Kelce's Complaint for Damages for:

12/22/2021: Plaintiff Shawn L. Kelce's Complaint for Damages for:

Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of SHAWN L. KELCE

01/12/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of SHAWN L. KELCE

Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of SHAWN L. KELCE

01/12/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of SHAWN L. KELCE

Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of SHAWN L. KELCE

01/26/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of SHAWN L. KELCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/02/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220202-01836.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of SHAWN L. KELCE; Filed By: SHAWN L. KELCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/18/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220118-01109.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/18/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220118-01105.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of SHAWN L. KELCE; Filed By: SHAWN L. KELCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of SHAWN L. KELCE; Filed By: SHAWN L. KELCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/23/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20211223-00061.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 02/20/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: SHAWN L. KELCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: SHAWN L. KELCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: SHAWN L. KELCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff Shawn L. Kelce's Complaint for Damages for:; Filed By: SHAWN L. KELCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of SHAWN L. KELCE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant