This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/19/2022 at 06:21:17 (UTC).

KAISER vs WORLDMARK THE CLUB

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 KAISER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WORLDMARK THE CLUB. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kira L. Klatchko. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5179

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kira L. Klatchko

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JAIME KAISER

MELISSA HORNECK

Defendants

WORLDMARK THE CLUB

WYNDHAM RESORT DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIAN JEFFREY VIRAG

Defendant Attorney

Daniel Lynn Ferguson

 

Court Documents

Minute Order: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service as to DEFENDANT

06/07/2022: Minute Order: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service as to DEFENDANT

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file Trial Setting Conference Declaration

06/07/2022: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file Trial Setting Conference Declaration

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to complete private mediation

06/07/2022: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to complete private mediation

Minute Order: Case Management Conference

06/07/2022: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

Defendant, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JAIME KAISER

06/07/2022: Defendant, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JAIME KAISER

Declaration RE: OSC for Failure to File Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JAIME KAISER

05/23/2022: Declaration RE: OSC for Failure to File Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JAIME KAISER

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

05/17/2022: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JAIME KAISER

05/16/2022: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JAIME KAISER

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JAIME KAISER

05/16/2022: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JAIME KAISER

Plaintiffs Notice of Posting Jury Fees on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JAIME KAISER

04/13/2022: Plaintiffs Notice of Posting Jury Fees on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JAIME KAISER

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JAIME KAISER

04/07/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JAIME KAISER

Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JAIME KAISER

04/06/2022: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JAIME KAISER

Certificate of Mailing

04/06/2022: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Case Management Conference

04/06/2022: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JAIME KAISER

03/15/2022: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JAIME KAISER

Notice of Remote Appearance for Hearing on Case Management Conference on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JAIME KAISER

03/11/2022: Notice of Remote Appearance for Hearing on Case Management Conference on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JAIME KAISER

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JAIME KAISER

03/11/2022: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JAIME KAISER

Amended Notice of Hearing (Civil)

03/10/2022: Amended Notice of Hearing (Civil)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to complete private mediation as to BRIAN JEFFREY VIRAG, Daniel Lynn Ferguson; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file Trial Setting Conference Declaration as to BRIAN JEFFREY VIRAG, Daniel Lynn Ferguson; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: TSC Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service as to DEFENDANT; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Held - Pre-disposition OSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/07/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220607-00802.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file Trial Setting Conference Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to complete private mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service as to DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JAIME KAISER; Filed By: WORLDMARK THE CLUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JAIME KAISER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JAIME KAISER; Filed By: JAIME KAISER; MELISSA HORNECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: JAIME KAISER; MELISSA HORNECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: JAIME KAISER; MELISSA HORNECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: JAIME KAISER; MELISSA HORNECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Damages; Filed By: JAIME KAISER; MELISSA HORNECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JAIME KAISER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Worldmark, The Club is a litigant

Latest cases where Wyndham Resort Development Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Lynn Ferguson