This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 19:49:58 (UTC).

KAINO & ATCHISON

Case Summary

On 01/05/2023 KAINO ATCHISON was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Hemet Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0056

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GRACE MEGUMI KAINO

Respondent

HALE WADE ATCHISON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Marlon Bradley Baldomero

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

01/05/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Petition or other first paper (including a joint petition) for dissolution of marriage or domestic partnership, legal separation, or nullity (GC70670B); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/05/2023; Fine Description: Check #129 Receipt No.: 20230105-00421.1; Paid: $450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023

DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Failure to Bring Case to Trial or Judgment; Expiration Date: 01/04/2028; Status: Active

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023

DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non Proof of Service of Summons and Petition; Expiration Date: 01/04/2026; Status: Active

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023

DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Schedule a Case Status Conference; Expiration Date: 01/05/2024; Status: Active

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023

DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Case Management Date: Proof of Service; Expiration Date: 03/06/2023; Status: Active

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Family Law Case Management Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: GRACE MEGUMI KAINO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Residence (RI-FL036); Filed By: GRACE MEGUMI KAINO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage FL-100; Filed By: GRACE MEGUMI KAINO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023

DocketFilings: Dissolution of Marriage Without Child(ren) filed by GRACE MEGUMI KAINO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less