This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/04/2021 at 13:36:17 (UTC).

JUSTIN KLATT & ENOLA ORONA vs MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 JUSTIN KLATT ENOLA ORONA filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sunshine Sykes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3572

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sunshine Sykes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JUSTIN KLATT & ENOLA ORONA

JACQUELINE BRAGG

CHERRYL & RICHARD COLLINS

AUDIE & TUTAIMA HUDNELL

SETH & JAYMIE MANNIE

MICHAEL & ANGELICA MCDUFFIE

MATTIE MEDINA

JULIUS PAMARAN

JOHN & SARAH RACINE

RAFAEL & MONICA ROLDAN

CARL & TAMI SEASTRAND

MICHAEL & AMBER WHITE

Defendant

MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Jeewoong Su

Defendant Attorney

Jessica L Moran

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Construction Defect

07/28/2021: Complaint for Construction Defect

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010)

07/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010)

Certificate of Counsel.

07/28/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

07/28/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Case Management Conference on Complaint for Construction Defect of JUSTIN KLATT & ENOLA ORONA

08/13/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference on Complaint for Construction Defect of JUSTIN KLATT & ENOLA ORONA

Notice of Department Assignment

08/13/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Proof of Service on Complaint for Construction Defect of JUSTIN KLATT & ENOLA ORONA

08/27/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Construction Defect of JUSTIN KLATT & ENOLA ORONA

Proof of Service by Mail re: See Document List on Complaint for Construction Defect of JUSTIN KLATT & ENOLA ORONA

10/12/2021: Proof of Service by Mail re: See Document List on Complaint for Construction Defect of JUSTIN KLATT & ENOLA ORONA

Compendium of Exhibits in support of Motion to Compel Arbitration on Complaint for Construction Defect of JUSTIN KLATT & ENOLA ORONA

10/06/2021: Compendium of Exhibits in support of Motion to Compel Arbitration on Complaint for Construction Defect of JUSTIN KLATT & ENOLA ORONA

Request for Judicial Notice in support of Motion to Compel Arbitration

10/06/2021: Request for Judicial Notice in support of Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration of Nicholas Emsiek in support of Motion to Compel Arbitration

10/06/2021: Declaration of Nicholas Emsiek in support of Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration of Jessica L Moran in support of Motion to Compel Arbitration

10/06/2021: Declaration of Jessica L Moran in support of Motion to Compel Arbitration

Motion to Compel Arbitration on Complaint for Construction Defect of JUSTIN KLATT & ENOLA ORONA

10/06/2021: Motion to Compel Arbitration on Complaint for Construction Defect of JUSTIN KLATT & ENOLA ORONA

Notice of Status Conference Hearing

10/22/2021: Notice of Status Conference Hearing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

10/22/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • HearingType: Status Conference Hearing; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference - Complex; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Status Conference Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/12/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *3011 Receipt No.: 20211012-00327.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Additional fee for case designated as complex - Defendant (GC70616B); Amount: $1,000.00; Paid: $1,000.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/12/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *3011 Receipt No.: 20211012-00327.1; Paid: $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service by Mail re: See Document List on Complaint for Construction Defect of JUSTIN KLATT & ENOLA ORONA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/12/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *3011 Receipt No.: 20211012-00327.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Construction Defect of JUSTIN KLATT & ENOLA ORONA; Filed By: JUSTIN KLATT & ENOLA ORONA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Additional fee for case designated as complex - Plaintiff (GC70616A); Amount: $1,000.00; Paid: $1,000.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/13/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1852 Receipt No.: 20210813-00027.1; Paid: $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/13/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1852 Receipt No.: 20210813-00027.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference on Complaint for Construction Defect of JUSTIN KLATT & ENOLA ORONA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: JUSTIN KLATT & ENOLA ORONA; JACQUELINE BRAGG; CHERRYL & RICHARD COLLINS; AUDIE & TUTAIMA HUDNELL; SETH & JAYMIE MANNIE; MICHAEL & ANGELICA MCDUFFIE; MATTIE MEDINA+

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: JUSTIN KLATT & ENOLA ORONA; JACQUELINE BRAGG; CHERRYL & RICHARD COLLINS; AUDIE & TUTAIMA HUDNELL; SETH & JAYMIE MANNIE; MICHAEL & ANGELICA MCDUFFIE; MATTIE MEDINA+

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010); Filed By: JUSTIN KLATT & ENOLA ORONA; JACQUELINE BRAGG; CHERRYL & RICHARD COLLINS; AUDIE & TUTAIMA HUDNELL; SETH & JAYMIE MANNIE; MICHAEL & ANGELICA MCDUFFIE; MATTIE MEDINA+

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Construction Defect; Filed By: JUSTIN KLATT & ENOLA ORONA; JACQUELINE BRAGG; CHERRYL & RICHARD COLLINS; AUDIE & TUTAIMA HUDNELL; SETH & JAYMIE MANNIE; MICHAEL & ANGELICA MCDUFFIE; MATTIE MEDINA+

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Construction Defect of JUSTIN KLATT & ENOLA ORONA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORAN, JESSICA LYNN