This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/21/2021 at 11:30:41 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. vs BARAJAS

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BARAJAS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7899

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A

Defendant

ELIZABETH L BARAJAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHANE T WATE

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Collections CRC 3.740 (under $10,000)

09/15/2021: Complaint for Collections CRC 3.740 (under $10,000)

Certificate of Counsel.

09/15/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

09/15/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Department Assignment

09/16/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Proof of Service on Complaint for Collections CRC 3.740 (Under $10,000) of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

10/04/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Collections CRC 3.740 (Under $10,000) of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

Declaration re Non Service of Summons, Complaint, Civil Case Cover Sheet, ADR Packet, Certificate of Counsel, Notice of Department Assignment

09/27/2021: Declaration re Non Service of Summons, Complaint, Civil Case Cover Sheet, ADR Packet, Certificate of Counsel, Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Collections CRC 3.740 (Under $10,000) of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.; Filed By: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration re Non Service of Summons, Complaint, Civil Case Cover Sheet, ADR Packet, Certificate of Counsel, Notice of Department Assignment; Filed By: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/16/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210916-00554.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Civil - Failure to file Default Judgment within 360 days as to JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.; Expiration Date: 09/10/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Collections CRC 3.740 (under $10,000); Filed By: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Collections CRC 3.740 (Under $10,000) of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wate, Shane Thomas