This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/11/2022 at 00:43:17 (UTC).

JONES vs DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 12/16/2021 JONES filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad Firetag. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5870

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chad Firetag

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUDY JONES

Defendants

DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

ARROWHEAD NEUROSURGICAL MEDICAL GROUP, INC

MICHAEL SCHIRALDI, M.D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Lawrence Oran

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000)

12/16/2021: Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

12/16/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

12/16/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Department Assignment

01/05/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

01/05/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Jury Fees on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of JUDY JONES

01/06/2022: Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Jury Fees on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of JUDY JONES

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/06/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220106-01420.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/06/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220106-01420.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Jury Fees on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of JUDY JONES; Filed By: JUDY JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/05/2022; Fine Description: Check #16980 Receipt No.: 20220105-00234.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 02/14/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: JUDY JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: JUDY JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: JUDY JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000); Filed By: JUDY JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of JUDY JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERA CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ORAN MICHAEL LAWRENCE