This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/02/2021 at 01:07:55 (UTC).

JIMENEZ vs CISO TRANSPORT, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 JIMENEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CISO TRANSPORT, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4748

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL JIMENEZ

Defendants

CISO TRANSPORT, INC

ERIC JOSE ENCISO

COFFMAN SPECIALTIES, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIEL W DUNBAR

 

Court Documents

Notice of Department Assignment

10/19/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

10/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

Certificate of Counsel.

10/15/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

10/15/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

10/15/2021: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MICHAEL JIMENEZ

10/27/2021: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MICHAEL JIMENEZ

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MICHAEL JIMENEZ; Filed By: MICHAEL JIMENEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/19/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20211019-00516.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 12/14/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: MICHAEL JIMENEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: MICHAEL JIMENEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: MICHAEL JIMENEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000); Filed By: MICHAEL JIMENEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MICHAEL JIMENEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COFFMAN SPECIALTIES, INC . is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUNBAR DANIEL