This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 17:16:16 (UTC).

JERROLD-JONES vs ROBINSON

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 JERROLD-JONES filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ROBINSON. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Raquel A. Marquez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8028

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Raquel A. Marquez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHAREE JERROLD-JONES

DAVID JERROLD-JONES

Defendants

MATTHEW ROBINSON, D.O

ORTHOPEDIC SURGERY AND SPORTS MEDICINE

INLAND VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER

SOUTHWEST HEALTHCARE SYSTEM

UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES, INC (UHS)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patricia Anne Law

Attorney at Patricia Anne Law

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000)

09/21/2021: Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

09/21/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

09/21/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Department Assignment

09/22/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

09/22/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Raquel A. Marquez; Location/Courtroom: Department S303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/22/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *8033 Receipt No.: 20210922-00593.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/22/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *8033 Receipt No.: 20210922-00593.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 11/20/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: CHAREE JERROLD-JONES; DAVID JERROLD-JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: CHAREE JERROLD-JONES; DAVID JERROLD-JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: CHAREE JERROLD-JONES; DAVID JERROLD-JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000); Filed By: CHAREE JERROLD-JONES; DAVID JERROLD-JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of CHAREE JERROLD-JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHWEST HEALTHCARE SYSTEM is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES INC. is a litigant