Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/23/2021 at 20:42:03 (UTC).

INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY vs KOHLER CO.

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against KOHLER CO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are David M. Chapman and James Latting. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2335

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

David M. Chapman

James Latting

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

LSP PRODUCTS GROUP, INC

KOHLER CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Susan Hope Green

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew John Liedle

Christopher Michael Cotter

 

Court Documents

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Over $25,000) of INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

06/28/2021: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Over $25,000) of INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Posting Jury Fee Deposit

06/16/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fee Deposit

Kohler Co.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Over $25,000) of INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

06/16/2021: Kohler Co.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Over $25,000) of INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Proof of Service on Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Over $25,000) of INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

06/02/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Over $25,000) of INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Case Management Conference

05/13/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

05/13/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Summons Issued and Filed

05/11/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

05/11/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Over $25,000)

05/11/2021: Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Over $25,000)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: James Latting; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/30/2021; Fine Description: Check #12220 Receipt No.: 20210630-00631.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Over $25,000) of INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Filed By: LSP PRODUCTS GROUP, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/25/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *6007 Receipt No.: 20210625-00002.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/25/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *6007 Receipt No.: 20210625-00002.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Posting Jury Fee Deposit; Filed By: KOHLER CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Kohler Co.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Over $25,000) of INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Filed By: KOHLER CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Over $25,000) of INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Filed By: INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Over $25,000) of INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Filed By: INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/13/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *9984 Receipt No.: 20210513-00335.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Over $25,000); Filed By: INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Over $25,000) of INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LSP Products Group Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where KOHLER CO. A WISCONSIN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN SUSAN HOPE