Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2021 at 14:42:54 (UTC).

In the Matter of: JACOB BISHAY

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 In the Matter of JACOB BISHAY was filed as a Probate - Disabled Compromise Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth Fernandez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0474

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Disabled Compromise Claim

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth Fernandez

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MICHAEL BISHAY

Minor

JACOB BISHAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Farris Elias Ain

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Acknowledgment of Receipt of Order and Funds for Deposit in Blocked Account; Filed By: MICHAEL BISHAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order to Deposit Funds In Blocked Account $9,023.65

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim. (MC-351); Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Proposed Orders after Hearing; Filed By: MICHAEL BISHAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketStatus: Proposed; Description: Proposed Order re: to Deposit Funds in Blocked Account; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketStatus: Proposed; Description: Proposed Order re: Approving Compromise of Claim; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • HearingProbate Notes: Hearing re Petition for Compromise of Pending Action of Minor/Person with a Disability filed by MICHAEL BISHAY at 10:00 AM in Department 11; Details; No SNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re Petition for Compromise of Pending Action of Minor/Person with a Disability filed by MICHAEL BISHAY; Judicial Officer: Kenneth Fernandez; Location/Courtroom: Department 11; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing re Petition for Compromise of Pending Action of Minor/Person with a Disability filed by MICHAEL BISHAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Court Reporter Fee Under 1 Hour; Amount: $30.00; Paid: $30.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/22/2021; Fine Description: Fee waiver Receipt No.: 20210322-00138.1; Paid: $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: First papers: Petition commencing other proceedings and objections or other opposition (GC70655); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/22/2021; Fine Description: Fee waiver Receipt No.: 20210322-00138.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Dept. 11 - Notice of Telephonic Hearing on Petition for Approval of Compromise of Claim or Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability MICHAEL BISHAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Assignment. (Probate); Filed By: MICHAEL BISHAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Petition for Compromise of Pending Action of Minor or /Person with a Disability.; Filed By: MICHAEL BISHAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted by Clerk; Filed By: MICHAEL BISHAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001); Filed By: MICHAEL BISHAY; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketFilings: Petition for Approval of Compromise of Claim or Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability MICHAEL BISHAY; Disposition: Judgment 05/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIN FARRIS ELIAS