This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/31/2021 at 17:14:42 (UTC).

In the Matter of: EMERY NEISSARI

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 In the Matter of EMERY NEISSARI was filed as a Probate - Disabled Compromise Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth Fernandez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1125

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Disabled Compromise Claim

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth Fernandez

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHEERIN NEISSARI

Minor

EMERY NEISSARI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Robert Terrence Simon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why Receipt for Deposit of Money has not been filed as to SHEERIN NEISSARI; Judicial Officer: Kenneth Fernandez; Location/Courtroom: Department 11; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Hearing Re: Order to Show Cause why Receipt for Deposit of Money has not been Filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Acknowledgment of Receipt of Order and Funds for Deposit in Blocked Account in the amount of $3,734.40; Filed By: SHEERIN NEISSARI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order to Deposit Funds In Blocked Account in the amount of $3,734.40

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order Approving Compromise of Claim or Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (MC-351)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • HearingProbate Notes: Hearing re Petition for Compromise of Pending Action of Minor/Person with a Disability filed by SHEERIN NEISSARI at 10:00 AM in Department 11; Details; No SNT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion for Petition for Order re Deposit of Money Belonging to a Minor SHEERIN NEISSARIPetition for Order re Deposit of Money Belonging to a Minor; Judicial Officer: Kenneth Fernandez; Location/Courtroom: Department 11; Disposition: Hearing Off-Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re Petition for Compromise of Pending Action of Minor/Person with a Disability filed by SHEERIN NEISSARI; Judicial Officer: Kenneth Fernandez; Location/Courtroom: Department 11; Disposition: Hearing Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion for Petition for Order re Deposit of Money Belonging to a Minor SHEERIN NEISSARIPetition for Order re Deposit of Money Belonging to a Minor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing re Petition for Compromise of Pending Action of Minor/Person with a Disability filed by SHEERIN NEISSARI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Court Reporter Fee Under 1 Hour; Amount: $30.00; Paid: $30.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/22/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1752 Receipt No.: 20210622-00419.1; Paid: $30.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Probate Motion Fee; Amount: $60.00; Paid: $60.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/22/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1752 Receipt No.: 20210622-00419.1; Paid: $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Court Reporter Fee Under 1 Hour; Amount: $30.00; Paid: $30.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/22/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1752 Receipt No.: 20210622-00400.1; Paid: $30.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: First papers: Petition commencing other proceedings and objections or other opposition (GC70655); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/22/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1752 Receipt No.: 20210622-00400.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Dept. 11 - Notice of Telephonic Hearing on Petition to approve Compromise of Pending Action of a Minor or Person with a Disability SHEERIN NEISSARI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Dept. 11 - Notice of Telephonic Hearing on Petition to approve Compromise of Pending Action of a Minor or Person with a Disability SHEERIN NEISSARI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Petition for Order re Deposit of Money Belonging to a Minor; Filed By: SHEERIN NEISSARI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Petition to approve Compromise of Pending Action of a Minor or Person with a Disability; Filed By: SHEERIN NEISSARI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketFilings: Petition to approve Compromise of Pending Action of a Minor or Person with a Disability SHEERIN NEISSARI; Disposition: Granted 07/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMON ROBERT TERRENCE