This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/06/2021 at 20:30:20 (UTC).

In re: 25572 LOREN WAYMORENO VALLEY, CA 92553

Case Summary

On 08/06/2021 In re 25572 LOREN WAYMORENO VALLEY, CA 92553 was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Belinda A. Handy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3987

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Belinda A. Handy

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CLEAR RECON CORP

Not Yet Classified

TREVOR STROMBECK

MARLENE STROMBECK

EASTERN MUNICIPAL WATER DISTRICT

SYNCHRONY BANK

CONSERVATORSHIP OF MARY MENUSAN

PAUL JOHNSON & CARL JOHNSON ETC

PAUL JOHNSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Casper J Rankin

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Stephanie Jo Boone

 

Court Documents

Petition and Declaration regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustees Sale (Over $25,000) (CIV-170)

08/06/2021: Petition and Declaration regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustees Sale (Over $25,000) (CIV-170)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/06/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

08/06/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support of allowing deposit of surplus funds

08/06/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support of allowing deposit of surplus funds

Proof of Service by Mail re: Petition re unresolved claims and deposit;memo of points and authorities, order to deposit;civil case cover sheet;certificate of counsel; notice of petition

08/06/2021: Proof of Service by Mail re: Petition re unresolved claims and deposit;memo of points and authorities, order to deposit;civil case cover sheet;certificate of counsel; notice of petition

Notice of Petition to superior court to deposit surplus funds

08/06/2021: Notice of Petition to superior court to deposit surplus funds

Notice of Hearing re: Petition on Unresolved Claims

08/31/2021: Notice of Hearing re: Petition on Unresolved Claims

Notice of Department Assignment

08/31/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Order to Deposit Surplus Funds

09/07/2021: Order to Deposit Surplus Funds

Proof of Service by Mail re: Petition on Petition for Unresolved Claims (Over $25,000) of CLEAR RECON CORP

09/20/2021: Proof of Service by Mail re: Petition on Petition for Unresolved Claims (Over $25,000) of CLEAR RECON CORP

Notice of Entry of Order to Allow Clear Recon Corp to Deposit the Surplus Proceeds of the Trustee's Sale and for the Discharge of Clear Recon Corp on Petition for Unresolved Claims (Over $25,000) of CLEAR RECON CORP

09/20/2021: Notice of Entry of Order to Allow Clear Recon Corp to Deposit the Surplus Proceeds of the Trustee's Sale and for the Discharge of Clear Recon Corp on Petition for Unresolved Claims (Over $25,000) of CLEAR RECON CORP

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF CLAIM FOR SURPLUS FUNDS

10/14/2021: SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF CLAIM FOR SURPLUS FUNDS

Minute Order: Hearing on Petition re: Unresolved Claims

11/02/2021: Minute Order: Hearing on Petition re: Unresolved Claims

Synchrony Bank's Notice of Claim for Surplus Funds and Supporting Declaration of Stephanie J. Boone

11/02/2021: Synchrony Bank's Notice of Claim for Surplus Funds and Supporting Declaration of Stephanie J. Boone

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Petition re: Unresolved Claims; Judicial Officer: Belinda A. Handy; Location/Courtroom: Department MV2; Disposition: Taken Under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Matter Taken Under Submission for: Hearing on Petition re: Unresolved Claims; Expiration Date: 12/02/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing on Petition re: Unresolved Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Synchrony Bank's Notice of Claim for Surplus Funds and Supporting Declaration of Stephanie J. Boone; Filed By: SYNCHRONY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF CLAIM FOR SURPLUS FUNDS; Filed By: CONSERVATORSHIP OF MARY MENUSAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service by Mail re: Petition on Petition for Unresolved Claims (Over $25,000) of CLEAR RECON CORP; Filed By: CLEAR RECON CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Entry of Order to Allow Clear Recon Corp to Deposit the Surplus Proceeds of the Trustee's Sale and for the Discharge of Clear Recon Corp on Petition for Unresolved Claims (Over $25,000) of CLEAR RECON CORP; Filed By: CLEAR RECON CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order to Deposit Surplus Funds; Filed By: CLEAR RECON CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Petition and Declaration regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale; Filed By: CLEAR RECON CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/31/2021; Fine Description: Check #257387 Receipt No.: 20210831-00710.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Hearing re: Petition on Unresolved Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketStatus: Proposed; Description: Proposed Order re: Deposit surplus funds; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Petition to superior court to deposit surplus funds; Filed By: CLEAR RECON CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service by Mail re: Petition re unresolved claims and deposit;memo of points and authorities, order to deposit;civil case cover sheet;certificate of counsel; notice of petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support of allowing deposit of surplus funds; Filed By: CLEAR RECON CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: CLEAR RECON CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: CLEAR RECON CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Petition and Declaration regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustees Sale (Over $25,000) (CIV-170); Filed By: CLEAR RECON CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketFilings: Petition for Unresolved Claims (Over $25,000) of CLEAR RECON CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Clear Recon Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOONE STEPHANIE JO