This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/01/2021 at 20:24:49 (UTC).

IMMEDIATE DISASTER SOLUTIONS, INC. vs FLORES

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 IMMEDIATE DISASTER SOLUTIONS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FLORES. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3733

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IMMEDIATE DISASTER SOLUTIONS, INC

Defendant

DIANA FLORES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRYAN THEIS

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

08/19/2021: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Summons Issued and Filed

08/19/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

08/19/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Department Assignment

08/20/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

08/20/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of IMMEDIATE DISASTER SOLUTIONS, INC.

08/31/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of IMMEDIATE DISASTER SOLUTIONS, INC.

Notice of Pendency of Action

09/02/2021: Notice of Pendency of Action

Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of IMMEDIATE DISASTER SOLUTIONS, INC.

09/09/2021: Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of IMMEDIATE DISASTER SOLUTIONS, INC.

Withdrawal of Notice of Pendency of Action

09/14/2021: Withdrawal of Notice of Pendency of Action

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/14/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *7023 Receipt No.: 20210914-01056.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Withdrawal of Notice of Pendency of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of IMMEDIATE DISASTER SOLUTIONS, INC.; Filed By: IMMEDIATE DISASTER SOLUTIONS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/07/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *7023 Receipt No.: 20210907-00250.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Pendency of Action; Filed By: IMMEDIATE DISASTER SOLUTIONS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of IMMEDIATE DISASTER SOLUTIONS, INC.; Filed By: IMMEDIATE DISASTER SOLUTIONS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/20/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210820-00188.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: IMMEDIATE DISASTER SOLUTIONS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: IMMEDIATE DISASTER SOLUTIONS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: IMMEDIATE DISASTER SOLUTIONS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000); Filed By: IMMEDIATE DISASTER SOLUTIONS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of IMMEDIATE DISASTER SOLUTIONS, INC.; Disposition: Dismissal After Other ADR 09/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer THEIS BRYAN KENTON