This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/29/2021 at 00:47:08 (UTC).

IKONTE vs RAO

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 IKONTE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RAO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad Firetag. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4054

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chad Firetag

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHIOMA IKONTE

Defendants

TARIQ SAEED RAO

MADEEHA SAEED RAO

SHADYAN SAEED

NAVEED ZUBERI

EVERGREEN PARTNERS REALTY, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Macauley Isioma Ekpenisi

Defendant Attorney

KEITH G BREMER

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

09/02/2021: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/02/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

09/02/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

09/02/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Department Assignment

09/07/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

09/07/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Defendants' Answer to the Complaint of Chioma Ikonte on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of CHIOMA IKONTE

09/30/2021: Defendants' Answer to the Complaint of Chioma Ikonte on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of CHIOMA IKONTE

Notice of Related Case(s): CVRI2000734

10/20/2021: Notice of Related Case(s): CVRI2000734

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/21/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *5656 Receipt No.: 20211021-00790.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Related Case(s): CVRI2000734; Filed By: CHIOMA IKONTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/01/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20211001-00152.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/01/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20211001-00152.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendants' Answer to the Complaint of Chioma Ikonte on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of CHIOMA IKONTE; Filed By: NAVEED ZUBERI; EVERGREEN PARTNERS REALTY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/07/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *5656 Receipt No.: 20210907-00788.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/07/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *5656 Receipt No.: 20210907-00447.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 11/01/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: CHIOMA IKONTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: CHIOMA IKONTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: CHIOMA IKONTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000); Filed By: CHIOMA IKONTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of CHIOMA IKONTE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BREMER KEITH