This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/17/2021 at 09:25:43 (UTC).

HUANG vs LOTZ

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 HUANG filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOTZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel Ottolia. The case status is Not Yet Classified.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1072

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Daniel Ottolia

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KE HSIUNG HUANG

MEILING ZHANG

Defendant

TY V. LOTZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barry Mark Regar

Defendant Attorney

Scott L. Macdonald

 

Court Documents

Notice of Court Ordered Mediation

09/01/2021: Notice of Court Ordered Mediation

Certificate of Mailing

08/31/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

08/31/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of KE HSIUNG HUANG

08/23/2021: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of KE HSIUNG HUANG

Case Management Statement

08/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

08/06/2021: Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees

05/12/2021: Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees

Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint; Demand for Trial by Jury on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of KE HSIUNG HUANG

05/12/2021: Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint; Demand for Trial by Jury on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of KE HSIUNG HUANG

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

04/12/2021: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of KE HSIUNG HUANG

03/26/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of KE HSIUNG HUANG

Notice of Case Management Conference

03/08/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

03/08/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

02/19/2021: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

02/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

02/19/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

02/19/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Response to Notice of Court Ordered Mediation Due; Expiration Date: 09/23/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Court Ordered Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Mediation Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement Due; Expiration Date: 04/11/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of KE HSIUNG HUANG; Filed By: TY V. LOTZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement; Filed By: KE HSIUNG HUANG; MEILING ZHANG

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of KE HSIUNG HUANG; Filed By: KE HSIUNG HUANG; MEILING ZHANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/08/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *4006 Receipt No.: 20210308-00194.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: KE HSIUNG HUANG; MEILING ZHANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: KE HSIUNG HUANG; MEILING ZHANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: KE HSIUNG HUANG; MEILING ZHANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000); Filed By: KE HSIUNG HUANG; MEILING ZHANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of KE HSIUNG HUANG

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACDONALD SCOTT L. ESQ.