This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/23/2022 at 09:07:32 (UTC).

HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION vs COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT,

Case Summary

On 07/14/2022 HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT,. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Craig Riemer. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3038

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Craig Riemer

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

Respondents

COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT

ALL PERSONS INTERESTED IN THE MATTER OF CVWDS ADOPTION OF REPLENISHMENT ASSESSMENT CHARGE RATES FOR FISCAL YEAR 2023 AND ALL PROCEEDINGS RELATED THERETO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JEFFREY LEE COSTELL JOSHUA STEWART STAMBAUGH SARA MARIE MCDUFFIE

Respondent Attorney

PAMELA KENTOS GRAHAM

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing

10/20/2022: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

10/20/2022: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Minute Order: Court Ruling re:

10/12/2022: Minute Order: Court Ruling re:

Proof of Service on Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Answer and Scope of Relief on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF, ITS MEMBERS AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

09/28/2022: Proof of Service on Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Answer and Scope of Relief on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF, ITS MEMBERS AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Joint Stipulation and Order Regarding Answer and Scope of Relief on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF, ITS MEMBERS AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

10/12/2022: Joint Stipulation and Order Regarding Answer and Scope of Relief on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF, ITS MEMBERS AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Notice of Document Return.

09/28/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

09/28/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Minute Order: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (CEQA)

09/20/2022: Minute Order: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (CEQA)

Coachella Valley Water District's Answer to Verified Petition and Complaint on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF, ITS MEMBERS AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

09/19/2022: Coachella Valley Water District's Answer to Verified Petition and Complaint on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF, ITS MEMBERS AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Joint Statement submitted Prior to 09/20/2022 on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF, ITS MEMBERS AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

09/13/2022: Joint Statement submitted Prior to 09/20/2022 on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF, ITS MEMBERS AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY PUBLICATION ON ALL PERSONS INTERESTED IN THE MATTER OF CVWD'S ADOPTION OF REPLENISHMENT ASSESSMENT CHARGE RATES FOR FISCAL YEAR 2023 AND ALL PROCEEDINGS RELATED THERETO on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of HOWARD J

08/31/2022: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY PUBLICATION ON ALL PERSONS INTERESTED IN THE MATTER OF CVWD'S ADOPTION OF REPLENISHMENT ASSESSMENT CHARGE RATES FOR FISCAL YEAR 2023 AND ALL PROCEEDINGS RELATED THERETO on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF, ITS MEMBERS AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF, ITS MEMBERS AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

08/25/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF, ITS MEMBERS AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Notice of Document Return.

08/25/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

08/23/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Ruling re: Plaintiff and Petitioner Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association's Application for Order for Publication of Summons on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF, ITS MEMBERS AND A

08/12/2022: Notice of Ruling re: Plaintiff and Petitioner Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association's Application for Order for Publication of Summons on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF, ITS MEMBERS AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Notice of: (1) Ruling Granting Plaintiff and Petitioner Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association's Unopposed Ex Parte Application for Entry of Order for Publication of Summons; and (2) Entry of Order for Publication Of Summons on Petition for Writ of Mand

08/12/2022: Notice of: (1) Ruling Granting Plaintiff and Petitioner Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association's Unopposed Ex Parte Application for Entry of Order for Publication of Summons; and (2) Entry of Order for Publication Of Summons on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF, ITS MEMBERS AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Proof of Service as to Class Action Case management Order #1 on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF, ITS MEMBERS AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

08/08/2022: Proof of Service as to Class Action Case management Order #1 on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF, ITS MEMBERS AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Minute Order: Ex Parte Hearing re: Plaintiff and Petitioner Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association's Unopposed Ex Parte Application for Entry of Order for Publication of Summons

08/11/2022: Minute Order: Ex Parte Hearing re: Plaintiff and Petitioner Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association's Unopposed Ex Parte Application for Entry of Order for Publication of Summons

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2022
  • HearingType: Hearing re: status of consolidation; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • HearingType: Court Ruling re:; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court Ruling re:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Joint Stipulation and Order Regarding Answer and Scope of Relief on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF, ITS MEMBERS AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED; Filed By: COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Continuance of Hearing or Case Management-Stipulation and Order-Service by Posting or Publication; Amount: $20.00; Paid: $20.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/06/2022; Fine Description: Exempt Receipt No.: EFM20221006-02017.1; Paid: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/22/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220722-01392.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Additional fee for case designated as complex - Plaintiff (GC70616A); Amount: $1,000.00; Paid: $1,000.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/22/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220722-01392.1; Paid: $1,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/22/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220722-01392.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Status Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010); Filed By: HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Class Action Verified Petition and Complaint; Filed By: HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketFilings: Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF, ITS MEMBERS AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED; Disposition: Consolidated 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less