This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/25/2023 at 14:01:34 (UTC).

HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION vs COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 10/14/2022 HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Craig Riemer, Harold W. Hopp and Chad Firetag. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4484

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

Craig Riemer

Harold W. Hopp

Chad Firetag

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

Respondents

COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT

ALL PERSONS INTERESTED IN THE MATTER OF CVWD'S ADOPTION OF CANAL WATER RATES FOR FISCAL YEAR 2023 AND ALL PROCEEDINGS RELATED THERETO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JEFFREY LEE COSTELL

Respondent Attorney

PAMELA KENTOS GRAHAM

 

Court Documents

Minute Order: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (Mandamus)

02/23/2023: Minute Order: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (Mandamus)

Proof of Service of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Consolidating Action with Case No. RIC1904943 For All Purposes on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

01/25/2023: Proof of Service of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Consolidating Action with Case No. RIC1904943 For All Purposes on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

Notice of Document Return.

01/25/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Stipulation and Order Consolidating Action with Case No. RIC190493 for All Purposes on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

02/07/2023: Stipulation and Order Consolidating Action with Case No. RIC190493 for All Purposes on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

Minute Order: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (Mandamus)

01/12/2023: Minute Order: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (Mandamus)

Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

01/03/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

Stipulation & Order to Reassign Case for all purposes to the Hon. Craig Riemer in D-1

01/03/2023: Stipulation & Order to Reassign Case for all purposes to the Hon. Craig Riemer in D-1

Certificate of Mailing

12/13/2022: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (Mandamus)

12/13/2022: Minute Order: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (Mandamus)

Notice of Document Return.

12/12/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Joint Statement Submitted Prior to December 13, 2022 Initial Status Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

12/06/2022: Joint Statement Submitted Prior to December 13, 2022 Initial Status Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

Proof of Service of Stipulation and Proposed Order on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

12/05/2022: Proof of Service of Stipulation and Proposed Order on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

Coachella Valley Water District's Answer to Verified Petition and Complaint on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

12/01/2022: Coachella Valley Water District's Answer to Verified Petition and Complaint on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

Proof of Service of Summons by Publication on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

11/21/2022: Proof of Service of Summons by Publication on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

Notice of Document Return.

11/21/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Class Action Case Management Order #1

10/24/2022: Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Class Action Case Management Order #1

Proof of Service of Class Action Case Management Order #1 on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

11/03/2022: Proof of Service of Class Action Case Management Order #1 on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

Proof of Service on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

11/01/2022: Proof of Service on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • HearingType: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (Mandamus); Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Hearing Off-Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (Mandamus)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Stipulation and Order Consolidating Action with Case No. RIC190493 for All Purposes on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION; Filed By: HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/27/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230127-00766.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Continuance of Hearing or Case Management-Stipulation and Order-Service by Posting or Publication; Amount: $20.00; Paid: $20.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/25/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230125-00430.1; Paid: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/25/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230125-00430.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Consolidating Action with Case No. RIC1904943 For All Purposes on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION; Filed By: HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • HearingType: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (Mandamus); Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (Mandamus)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Related Case; Filed By: HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: PROOF OF SERVICE OF STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER PERMITTING SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED IN PLEADING FORMAT on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION; Filed By: HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Status Hearing Petition for Writ of Mandate (Mandamus) on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Verified Petition and Complaint; Filed By: HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010); Filed By: HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketFilings: Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION; Disposition: Consolidated 02/07/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less