*******4484
10/14/2022
Other - Consolidated
Other - Writ Of Mandamus
Riverside, California
Craig Riemer
Harold W. Hopp
Chad Firetag
HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION
COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT
ALL PERSONS INTERESTED IN THE MATTER OF CVWD'S ADOPTION OF CANAL WATER RATES FOR FISCAL YEAR 2023 AND ALL PROCEEDINGS RELATED THERETO
JEFFREY LEE COSTELL
PAMELA KENTOS GRAHAM
02/23/2023: Minute Order: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (Mandamus)
01/25/2023: Proof of Service of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Consolidating Action with Case No. RIC1904943 For All Purposes on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION
01/25/2023: Notice of Document Return.
02/07/2023: Stipulation and Order Consolidating Action with Case No. RIC190493 for All Purposes on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION
01/12/2023: Minute Order: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (Mandamus)
01/03/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment to Department
01/03/2023: Stipulation & Order to Reassign Case for all purposes to the Hon. Craig Riemer in D-1
12/13/2022: Certificate of Mailing
12/13/2022: Minute Order: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (Mandamus)
12/12/2022: Notice of Document Return.
12/06/2022: Joint Statement Submitted Prior to December 13, 2022 Initial Status Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION
12/05/2022: Proof of Service of Stipulation and Proposed Order on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION
12/01/2022: Coachella Valley Water District's Answer to Verified Petition and Complaint on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION
11/21/2022: Proof of Service of Summons by Publication on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION
11/21/2022: Notice of Document Return.
10/24/2022: Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Class Action Case Management Order #1
11/03/2022: Proof of Service of Class Action Case Management Order #1 on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION
11/01/2022: Proof of Service on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION
HearingType: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (Mandamus); Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1
[-] Read LessHearingType: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (Mandamus); Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Completed
[-] Read LessDocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (Mandamus)
[-] Read LessDocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Reassignment to Department
[-] Read LessDocketStatus: Filed; Description: Stipulation & Order to Reassign Case for all purposes to the Hon. Craig Riemer in D-1; Filed By: COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT
[-] Read LessHearingType: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (Mandamus); Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Continued Not Held - Court's Motion - Hearing
[-] Read LessDocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing
[-] Read LessDocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (Mandamus)
[-] Read LessDocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.
[-] Read LessFinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/08/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221208-01719.1; Paid: $1.00
[-] Read LessDocketStatus: Filed; Description: PROOF OF SERVICE OF STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER PERMITTING SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED IN PLEADING FORMAT on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION; Filed By: HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION
[-] Read LessFinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Additional fee for case designated as complex - Plaintiff (GC70616A); Amount: $1,000.00; Paid: $1,000.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/17/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221017-01692.1; Paid: $1,000.00
[-] Read LessFinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/17/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221017-01692.1; Paid: $450.00
[-] Read LessDocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.
[-] Read LessDocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Status Hearing Petition for Writ of Mandate (Mandamus) on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION
[-] Read LessDocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment
[-] Read LessDocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010); Filed By: HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION
[-] Read LessDocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION
[-] Read LessDocketStatus: Filed; Description: Verified Petition and Complaint; Filed By: HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION
[-] Read LessDocketFilings: Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION
[-] Read Less