This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/07/2023 at 09:03:35 (UTC).

HOPPS vs COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 12/22/2022 HOPPS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Manuel Bustamante. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4984

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Manuel Bustamante

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STIRLING HOPPS

Defendant

COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MARC COLEMAN

Defendant Attorney

Atkinson, Andelson, Loya, Ruud & Romo

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file Trial Setting Declaration pursuant to Dept PS2 Rules

07/03/2023: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file Trial Setting Declaration pursuant to Dept PS2 Rules

Certificate of Mailing

07/03/2023: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

07/03/2023: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Notice of Appearance 07/05/2023 on 1st Amended Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of STIRLING HOPPS

06/26/2023: Notice of Appearance 07/05/2023 on 1st Amended Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of STIRLING HOPPS

Notice of Remote Appearance for Hearing on July 5, 2023 on 1st Amended Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of STIRLING HOPPS

06/23/2023: Notice of Remote Appearance for Hearing on July 5, 2023 on 1st Amended Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of STIRLING HOPPS

Case Management Statement on 1st Amended Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of STIRLING HOPPS

06/20/2023: Case Management Statement on 1st Amended Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of STIRLING HOPPS

Case Management Statement on 1st Amended Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of STIRLING HOPPS

06/20/2023: Case Management Statement on 1st Amended Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of STIRLING HOPPS

Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of STIRLING HOPPS

05/22/2023: Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of STIRLING HOPPS

CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION on 1st Amended Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of STIRLING HOPPS

05/22/2023: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION on 1st Amended Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of STIRLING HOPPS

Declaration of Marc Coleman in Response to Order to Show Cause why Sanctions should not be Imposed for the Failure to Timely File Proof of Service of Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of STIRLING HOPPS

05/12/2023: Declaration of Marc Coleman in Response to Order to Show Cause why Sanctions should not be Imposed for the Failure to Timely File Proof of Service of Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of STIRLING HOPPS

Notice of Errata re Proof of Service for Defendant's Answer to First Amended Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of STIRLING HOPPS

03/27/2023: Notice of Errata re Proof of Service for Defendant's Answer to First Amended Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of STIRLING HOPPS

Defendant Coachella Valley Water District's Answer to Plaintiff Stirling Hopps' First Amended Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of STIRLING HOPPS

03/27/2023: Defendant Coachella Valley Water District's Answer to Plaintiff Stirling Hopps' First Amended Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of STIRLING HOPPS

Amended Proof of Service of Summons on First Amended Complaint; First Amended Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of STIRLING HOPPS

03/14/2023: Amended Proof of Service of Summons on First Amended Complaint; First Amended Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of STIRLING HOPPS

Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of STIRLING HOPPS

03/15/2023: Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of STIRLING HOPPS

Proof of Service of Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Counsel, Notice of Department Assignment, Notice of Case Management Conference, Civil Case Coversheet, Alternative Dispute Resolution Information Package on 1st Amended Complaint for Wrongful Ter

03/09/2023: Proof of Service of Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Counsel, Notice of Department Assignment, Notice of Case Management Conference, Civil Case Coversheet, Alternative Dispute Resolution Information Package on 1st Amended Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of STIRLING HOPPS

Notice of Case Management Conference

03/09/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Document Return.

03/15/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

03/13/2023: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2024
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Manuel Bustamante; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2024
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file Trial Setting Declaration pursuant to Dept PS2 Rules as to LAW OFFICES OF MARC COLEMAN, Atkinson, Andelson, Loya, Ruud & Romo; Judicial Officer: Manuel Bustamante; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Manuel Bustamante; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Manuel Bustamante; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file Trial Setting Declaration pursuant to Dept PS2 Rules

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/27/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230627-00403.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/26/2023; Fine Description: Exempt Receipt No.: EFM20230626-00260.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Appearance 07/05/2023 on 1st Amended Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of STIRLING HOPPS; Filed By: STIRLING HOPPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/05/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230105-01555.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief; Filed By: STIRLING HOPPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: STIRLING HOPPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: STIRLING HOPPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: STIRLING HOPPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less