This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/06/2023 at 22:43:51 (UTC).

HOPPS vs COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 12/22/2022 HOPPS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Manuel Bustamante. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4984

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Manuel Bustamante

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STIRLING HOPPS

Defendant

COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARC ALLEN COLEMAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief

12/22/2022: Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

12/22/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

12/22/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

01/05/2023: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

01/05/2023: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

01/05/2023: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

01/05/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

01/05/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Manuel Bustamante; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/05/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230105-01555.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/05/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230105-01555.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 02/20/2023; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: STIRLING HOPPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: STIRLING HOPPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: STIRLING HOPPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief; Filed By: STIRLING HOPPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of STIRLING HOPPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less