This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/21/2022 at 23:27:09 (UTC).

HOLMES vs CRST INC.

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 HOLMES filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CRST INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1875

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERIC HOLMES

Defendants

CRST EXPEDITED, INC

CRST INC

CRST TRAINING SCHOOL

CRST INTERNATIONAL INC

CRST SPECIALIZED TRANSPORTATION INC

CRST LINCOLN SALES INC

CRST THE TRANSPORTATAION SOLUTION INC (DEDICATED WEST DIVISION)

MICHAEL HYNES

CASSIE BURRILL

JACKIE [LAST NAME UNKNOWN]

JESSICA [LAST NAME UNKNOWN]

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OLIVIA UZAN

Defendant Attorney

KRISTEN JEANNINE NESBIT

 

Court Documents

Defendant CRST Expedited Inc dba CRST The Transportation Inc (Dedicated West Division) Formerly Known as Gardner Trucking Inc (Erroneously Sued as Gardner Trucking) Answer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $2

06/16/2022: Defendant CRST Expedited Inc dba CRST The Transportation Inc (Dedicated West Division) Formerly Known as Gardner Trucking Inc (Erroneously Sued as Gardner Trucking) Answer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERIC HOLMES

Notice to state court and plaintiff of filing of notice of removal on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERIC HOLMES

06/15/2022: Notice to state court and plaintiff of filing of notice of removal on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERIC HOLMES

Notice of Document Return.

06/16/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERIC HOLMES

06/14/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERIC HOLMES

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERIC HOLMES

06/14/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERIC HOLMES

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERIC HOLMES

06/14/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERIC HOLMES

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERIC HOLMES

06/14/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERIC HOLMES

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERIC HOLMES

06/14/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERIC HOLMES

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERIC HOLMES

06/14/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERIC HOLMES

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERIC HOLMES

06/14/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERIC HOLMES

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERIC HOLMES

05/12/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERIC HOLMES

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)

05/12/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

05/12/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

05/12/2022: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Complaint for Monetary and Punitive Damages

05/11/2022: Complaint for Monetary and Punitive Damages

Summons Issued and Filed

05/11/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

05/11/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/16/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220616-01504.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/16/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220616-01504.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/16/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220616-01414.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/16/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220616-00158.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendant CRST Expedited Inc dba CRST The Transportation Inc (Dedicated West Division) Formerly Known as Gardner Trucking Inc (Erroneously Sued as Gardner Trucking) Answer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERIC HOLMES; Filed By: CRST EXPEDITED, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice to state court and plaintiff of filing of notice of removal on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERIC HOLMES; Filed By: CRST INC.; CRST INTERNATIONAL INC.; CRST LINCOLN SALES INC.; GARDNER TRUCKING; CASSIE BURRILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERIC HOLMES; Filed By: ERIC HOLMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERIC HOLMES; Filed By: ERIC HOLMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/12/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220512-00584.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERIC HOLMES; Filed By: ERIC HOLMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Monetary and Punitive Damages; Filed By: ERIC HOLMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: ERIC HOLMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: ERIC HOLMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ERIC HOLMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERIC HOLMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less