This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2022 at 10:46:48 (UTC).

HOLMES vs CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/16/2022 HOLMES filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Raquel A. Marquez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8221

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Raquel A. Marquez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIARA HOLMES

Defendant

CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDWARD ANTONINO

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

12/16/2022: Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

Summons Issued and Filed

12/16/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

12/16/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted by Clerk on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of KIARA HOLMES

12/19/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted by Clerk on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of KIARA HOLMES

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

12/19/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

12/19/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Raquel A. Marquez; Location/Courtroom: Department S303

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/19/2022; Fine Description: Fee waiver Receipt No.: EFM20221219-00115.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/19/2022; Fine Description: Fee waiver Receipt No.: EFM20221219-00115.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted by Clerk on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of KIARA HOLMES; Filed By: KIARA HOLMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 02/14/2023; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of KIARA HOLMES; Filed By: KIARA HOLMES; Confidential: YES Confidential

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: KIARA HOLMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: KIARA HOLMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: KIARA HOLMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000); Filed By: KIARA HOLMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of KIARA HOLMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Antonino, Edward