This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/19/2022 at 01:07:29 (UTC).

HICKS vs FCA US, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/14/2022 HICKS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US, LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2904

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES W. HICKS

Defendant

FCA US, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEAL F. MORROW, III

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

07/14/2022: PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

Summons Issued and Filed

07/14/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

07/14/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

07/15/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

07/15/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/15/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220715-00960.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/15/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220715-00960.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 09/12/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: JAMES W. HICKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: JAMES W. HICKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: JAMES W. HICKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; Filed By: JAMES W. HICKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of JAMES W. HICKS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORROW NEAL F.