This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/13/2021 at 09:43:11 (UTC).

HERRERA vs STAFFMARK INVESTMENT LLC

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 HERRERA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against STAFFMARK INVESTMENT LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Craig Riemer. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2712

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Craig Riemer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLY HERRERA

Defendants

STAFFMARK INVESTMENT LLC

RUST-OLEUMM CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy John Gonzales

Defendant Attorney

SUSAN STEWARD

 

Court Documents

Rust-Oleum Corporation's Notice of Removal of Action to United States District Court on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of WILLY HERRERA

08/03/2021: Rust-Oleum Corporation's Notice of Removal of Action to United States District Court on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of WILLY HERRERA

Defendant Staffmark Investment LLC's Answer to Plaintiff Willy Herrera's Complaint for Damages on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of WILLY HERRERA

08/02/2021: Defendant Staffmark Investment LLC's Answer to Plaintiff Willy Herrera's Complaint for Damages on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of WILLY HERRERA

Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of WILLY HERRERA

07/15/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of WILLY HERRERA

Summons Issued and Filed

06/02/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

06/02/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/02/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

06/02/2021: Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

Notice of Case Management Conference

06/24/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

06/24/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/03/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210803-00614.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Rust-Oleum Corporation's Notice of Removal of Action to United States District Court on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of WILLY HERRERA; Filed By: RUST-OLEUMM CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendant Staffmark Investment LLC's Answer to Plaintiff Willy Herrera's Complaint for Damages on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of WILLY HERRERA; Filed By: STAFFMARK INVESTMENT LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of WILLY HERRERA; Filed By: WILLY HERRERA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of WILLY HERRERA; Filed By: WILLY HERRERA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/24/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *9403 Receipt No.: 20210624-00640.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: WILLY HERRERA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: WILLY HERRERA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: WILLY HERRERA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000); Filed By: WILLY HERRERA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of WILLY HERRERA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STAFFMARK INVESTMENT, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RUST-OLEUM CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant