This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/20/2021 at 19:17:01 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ vs SORENSEN

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SORENSEN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4809

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATILDE DE JESUS HERNANDEZ

Defendant

THOMAS SORENSEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jerry Rulsky

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

09/13/2021: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

09/13/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

09/13/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Department Assignment

09/21/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

09/21/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/21/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1018 Receipt No.: 20210921-00414.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/21/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1018 Receipt No.: 20210921-00414.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 11/12/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: MATILDE DE JESUS HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: MATILDE DE JESUS HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: MATILDE DE JESUS HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000); Filed By: MATILDE DE JESUS HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MATILDE DE JESUS HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RULSKY JERRY