This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/03/2023 at 12:08:37 (UTC).

HENDERSON vs NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 HENDERSON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad Firetag. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5062

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chad Firetag

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHILLIP HENDERSON, JR

Defendant

NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIONNA DOLIN

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL P. SWEENEY

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Violation of Statutory Obligations

11/18/2022: Complaint for Violation of Statutory Obligations

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

11/18/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

11/18/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

11/21/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

11/21/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of PHILLIP HENDERSON, JR

11/23/2022: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of PHILLIP HENDERSON, JR

Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of PHILLIP HENDERSON, JR

12/21/2022: Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of PHILLIP HENDERSON, JR

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/21/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221221-01677.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/21/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221221-01677.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of PHILLIP HENDERSON, JR; Filed By: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/23/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221123-01822.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of PHILLIP HENDERSON, JR; Filed By: PHILLIP HENDERSON, JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/21/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221121-01508.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/21/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221121-01508.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PHILLIP HENDERSON, JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: PHILLIP HENDERSON, JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: PHILLIP HENDERSON, JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Violation of Statutory Obligations; Filed By: PHILLIP HENDERSON, JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of PHILLIP HENDERSON, JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nissan North America Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWEENEY MICHAEL P