This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/30/2021 at 11:57:38 (UTC).

HENDERSON vs MURRIETA VALLEY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 HENDERSON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MURRIETA VALLEY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7710

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL HENDERSON

Defendants

MURRIETA VALLEY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

JACI CLAWSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TERRY K DAVIS

Defendant Attorney

DENNIS J WALSH

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

09/08/2021: Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

Summons Issued and Filed

09/08/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

09/08/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/08/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

09/10/2021: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

09/10/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

09/10/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Defendant Murrieta Valley Unified School District's Answer to the Complaint of Plaintiff Michael Henderson on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of MICHAEL HENDERSON

10/19/2021: Defendant Murrieta Valley Unified School District's Answer to the Complaint of Plaintiff Michael Henderson on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of MICHAEL HENDERSON

Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of MICHAEL HENDERSON

10/12/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of MICHAEL HENDERSON

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department S303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendant Murrieta Valley Unified School District's Answer to the Complaint of Plaintiff Michael Henderson on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of MICHAEL HENDERSON; Filed By: MURRIETA VALLEY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of MICHAEL HENDERSON; Filed By: MICHAEL HENDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/10/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210910-00751.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 11/07/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: MICHAEL HENDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: MICHAEL HENDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: MICHAEL HENDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000); Filed By: MICHAEL HENDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of MICHAEL HENDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MURRIETA VALLEY UNIFIED SCHOOLDISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALSH DENNIS J. ESQ.