This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/18/2021 at 00:21:51 (UTC).

HARLICKER vs INDEPENDENT DEALER GROUP INC

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 HARLICKER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against INDEPENDENT DEALER GROUP INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Harold W. Hopp. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1675

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Harold W. Hopp

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DILLON HARLICKER

Defendants

INDEPENDENT DEALER GROUP INC

SMART AUTOCARE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jared Peterson

Defendant Attorney

ROGER S. RAPHAEL

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued and Filed

03/29/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

03/29/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

03/29/2021: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

04/13/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

04/13/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of DILLON HARLICKER

07/01/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of DILLON HARLICKER

Defendant Independent Dealer Group Inc, A New Jersey Domiciled Corporation dba Smart Autocare's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of DILLON HARLICKER

07/26/2021: Defendant Independent Dealer Group Inc, A New Jersey Domiciled Corporation dba Smart Autocare's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of DILLON HARLICKER

Amended Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

10/07/2021: Amended Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file a complete case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725 (c)

10/07/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file a complete case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725 (c)

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file a complete case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725 (c)

10/07/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file a complete case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725 (c)

Certificate of Mailing

10/07/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

10/07/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Minute Order: Case Management Conference

10/12/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of DILLON HARLICKER

10/07/2021: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of DILLON HARLICKER

Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725

10/06/2021: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file a complete case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725 (c) as to INDEPENDENT DEALER GROUP INC, ROGER S. RAPHAEL; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file a complete case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725 (c) as to Jared Peterson, DILLON HARLICKER; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Continued Not Held - Court's Motion - Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/12/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *6310 Receipt No.: 20211012-00129.1; Paid: $2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Complete

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file a complete case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725 (c)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file a complete case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725 (c)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendant Independent Dealer Group Inc, A New Jersey Domiciled Corporation dba Smart Autocare's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of DILLON HARLICKER; Filed By: INDEPENDENT DEALER GROUP INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of DILLON HARLICKER; Filed By: DILLON HARLICKER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/13/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *6310 Receipt No.: 20210413-00043.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: DILLON HARLICKER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: DILLON HARLICKER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: DILLON HARLICKER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000); Filed By: DILLON HARLICKER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of DILLON HARLICKER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less