Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 15:24:58 (UTC).

HANA vs BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 HANA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Raquel A. Marquez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4986

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Raquel A. Marquez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MELANIE HANA

Defendant

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Lorne Starr

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MELANIE HANA

06/23/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MELANIE HANA

Notice of Case Management Conference

06/10/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

06/10/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Summons Issued and Filed

06/09/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

06/09/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/09/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

06/09/2021: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Raquel A. Marquez; Location/Courtroom: Department S303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MELANIE HANA; Filed By: MELANIE HANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/10/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1178 Receipt No.: 20210610-00645.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: MELANIE HANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: MELANIE HANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: MELANIE HANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000); Filed By: MELANIE HANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MELANIE HANA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STARR ROBERT LORNE