This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/09/2021 at 00:25:01 (UTC).

GUZMAN vs MONEY TRANSER ACQUISITION INC.

Case Summary

On 12/03/2021 GUZMAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MONEY TRANSER ACQUISITION INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Harold W. Hopp. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5552

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Harold W. Hopp

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARITZA GARCIA GUZMAN

JACKELINE GARCIA GUZMAN

Defendants

MONEY TRANSER ACQUISITION INC

ANTONIO FERNANDEZ

DOLEX DOLLAR EXPRESS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patricia Denise Salcedo

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/08/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

12/08/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/08/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *0861 Receipt No.: 20211208-00482.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/08/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *0861 Receipt No.: 20211208-00482.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 02/01/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: MARITZA GARCIA GUZMAN; JACKELINE GARCIA GUZMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: MARITZA GARCIA GUZMAN; JACKELINE GARCIA GUZMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: MARITZA GARCIA GUZMAN; JACKELINE GARCIA GUZMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000); Filed By: MARITZA GARCIA GUZMAN; JACKELINE GARCIA GUZMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MARITZA GARCIA GUZMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DOLEX DOLLAR EXPRESS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALABISE PATRICIA DENISE