This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2021 at 08:57:27 (UTC).

GROTHE vs TOSCANA HOMES INC.,

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 GROTHE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TOSCANA HOMES INC . This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chad Firetag, David M. Chapman and James Latting. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0620

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chad Firetag

David M. Chapman

James Latting

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JACK GROTHE

EMILY GROTHE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

TOSCANA HOMES INC.

TOSCANA LAND, LLC

TOSCANA HOMES, LP

KDI ELEMENTS

Cross Defendants

P&P CONTRACTING

KDI ELEMENTS

CALLAGHAN CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION, INC

RICHARD MARSHALL FINE FLOORING

GREENDAY PLASTERING, INC

NEI, INC

RICHARD MARSHALL FINE FLOORING, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Jordan Gilliland, Jr

Guralnick & Gilliland, LLP

Attorney at Guralnick & Gilliland, LLP

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Fred R. Vasquez

Wood Smith Henning & Berman LLP

Attorney at Wood Smith Henning & Berman LLP

Mona Jane Jeffery

Jeffery & Grosfeld LLP

Attorney at Jeffery & Grosfeld LLP

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Mona Jane Jeffery

Jeffery & Grosfeld LLP

Attorney at Jeffery & Grosfeld LLP

Murchison & Cumming, LLP

Attorney at Murchison & Cumming, LLP

BASSI, EDLIN, HUIE, & BLUM LLP

Attorney at BASSI, EDLIN, HUIE, & BLUM LLP

Megumi Horiuchi

 

Court Documents

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of JACK GROTHE

03/08/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of JACK GROTHE

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of JACK GROTHE

03/08/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of JACK GROTHE

Proof of Service of Summons on Cross-Complaint of TOSCANA HOMES INC.,

06/04/2021: Proof of Service of Summons on Cross-Complaint of TOSCANA HOMES INC.,

Proof of Service of Summons on Cross-Complaint of TOSCANA HOMES INC.,

06/04/2021: Proof of Service of Summons on Cross-Complaint of TOSCANA HOMES INC.,

Proof of Service of Summons on Cross-Complaint of TOSCANA HOMES INC.,

06/04/2021: Proof of Service of Summons on Cross-Complaint of TOSCANA HOMES INC.,

Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint of TOSCANA HOMES INC.,

09/03/2021: Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint of TOSCANA HOMES INC.,

Notice of Document Return.

09/01/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Answer of Callanghan Concrete Construction Inc. To Cross-Complaint of Toscana Homes, Inc Toscana Land llc and Toscana Homes LP on Cross-Complaint of TOSCANA HOMES INC.,

08/05/2021: Answer of Callanghan Concrete Construction Inc. To Cross-Complaint of Toscana Homes, Inc Toscana Land llc and Toscana Homes LP on Cross-Complaint of TOSCANA HOMES INC.,

Minute Order: Case Management Conference

08/10/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Cross-Complaint of TOSCANA HOMES INC.,

08/09/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Cross-Complaint of TOSCANA HOMES INC.,

NOTICE O FJURY FEE DEPOSIT ON BEHALF OF CROSS-DEFENDANT CALLAGHAN CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION INC on Cross-Complaint of TOSCANA HOMES INC.,

08/05/2021: NOTICE O FJURY FEE DEPOSIT ON BEHALF OF CROSS-DEFENDANT CALLAGHAN CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION INC on Cross-Complaint of TOSCANA HOMES INC.,

Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Cross-Complaint of TOSCANA HOMES INC.,

08/05/2021: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Cross-Complaint of TOSCANA HOMES INC.,

Notice of Deposit Jury Fees on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of JACK GROTHE

08/03/2021: Notice of Deposit Jury Fees on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of JACK GROTHE

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

07/27/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of JACK GROTHE

07/26/2021: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of JACK GROTHE

Case Management Statement on Cross-Complaint of KDI ELEMENTS

07/26/2021: Case Management Statement on Cross-Complaint of KDI ELEMENTS

Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees

07/26/2021: Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

07/26/2021: Case Management Statement

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint of TOSCANA HOMES INC.,; Filed By: TOSCANA HOMES INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Continued - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/09/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210809-00456.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Cross-Complaint of TOSCANA HOMES INC.,; Filed By: RICHARD MARSHALL FINE FLOORING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/05/2021; Fine Description: Check #178445 Receipt No.: 20210805-00423.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/05/2021; Fine Description: Check #178658 Receipt No.: 20210805-00408.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: NOTICE O FJURY FEE DEPOSIT ON BEHALF OF CROSS-DEFENDANT CALLAGHAN CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION INC on Cross-Complaint of TOSCANA HOMES INC.,; Filed By: CALLAGHAN CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketStatus: Proposed; Description: Proposed Order re: Granting Motion Transferring the Action to the Riverside County Superior Court, Palm Springs Branch; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Motion for Order Transferring the Action to the Riverside County Superior Court, Palm Springs Branch on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of JACK GROTHE; Filed By: JACK GROTHE; EMILY GROTHE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/11/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *2099 Receipt No.: 20210211-02791.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: JACK GROTHE; EMILY GROTHE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: JACK GROTHE; EMILY GROTHE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: JACK GROTHE; EMILY GROTHE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000); Filed By: JACK GROTHE; EMILY GROTHE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of JACK GROTHE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALLAGHAN CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where P&P CONTRACTING is a litigant

Latest cases where GREENDAY PLASTERING, INC is a litigant