This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/30/2021 at 12:59:28 (UTC).

GRESEN vs RUCH

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 GRESEN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against RUCH. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kira L. Klatchko. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2957

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kira L. Klatchko

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOLOMON GRESEN

Defendants

DAVID RUCH

LAWRENCE J ROTHENBERG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Solomon Eric Gresen

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

06/21/2021: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

06/21/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

06/21/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

06/28/2021: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Department Assignment

06/28/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

06/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Continued Case Management Conference

09/30/2021: Notice of Continued Case Management Conference

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of SOLOMON GRESEN

09/27/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of SOLOMON GRESEN

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of SOLOMON GRESEN

09/27/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of SOLOMON GRESEN

Certificate of Mailing

09/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

09/22/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

09/17/2021: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of SOLOMON GRESEN

09/17/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of SOLOMON GRESEN

Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed for failure to file Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of SOLOMON GRESEN

09/17/2021: Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed for failure to file Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of SOLOMON GRESEN

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

10/15/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service as to defendants; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service as to defendants; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of SOLOMON GRESEN; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/05/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *0595 Receipt No.: 20211005-00729.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Continued Case Management Conference; Filed By: SOLOMON GRESEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/30/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *0595 Receipt No.: 20210930-00758.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of SOLOMON GRESEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/28/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *0595 Receipt No.: 20210628-00132.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: SOLOMON GRESEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: SOLOMON GRESEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: SOLOMON GRESEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000); Filed By: SOLOMON GRESEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of SOLOMON GRESEN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRESEN SOLOMON E.