This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/30/2021 at 00:29:13 (UTC).

GRAHAM vs 7-ELEVEN, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 GRAHAM filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 7-ELEVEN, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John W. Vineyard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5411

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

John W. Vineyard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JESSICA GRAHAM

Defendants

7-ELEVEN, INC

CN CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wesley Bismark Westphal

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/29/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

11/29/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Summons Issued and Filed

11/23/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

11/23/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

11/23/2021: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: John W. Vineyard; Location/Courtroom: Department 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/29/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *6148 Receipt No.: 20211129-00711.1; Paid: $2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/29/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *6148 Receipt No.: 20211129-00711.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 01/22/2022; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: JESSICA GRAHAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: JESSICA GRAHAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: JESSICA GRAHAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: JESSICA GRAHAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JESSICA GRAHAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C.N. is a litigant

Latest cases where 7-ELEVEN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WESTPHAL WESLEY