This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 22:41:50 (UTC).

GOODLANDER vs SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 GOODLANDER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2859

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CINDY GOODLANDER

Defendant

SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEPEHR DAGHIGHIAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

07/19/2022: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

07/19/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

07/19/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

07/26/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

07/26/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/26/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220726-01940.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/26/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220726-01940.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 09/17/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: CINDY GOODLANDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: CINDY GOODLANDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: CINDY GOODLANDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000); Filed By: CINDY GOODLANDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of CINDY GOODLANDER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Subaru of America, Inc., a New Jersey corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAGHIGHIAN, SEPEHR