This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/03/2022 at 03:22:05 (UTC).

GODFREY vs OMNI HOTELS MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/01/2022 GODFREY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against OMNI HOTELS MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0841

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRANDON GODFREY

Defendant

OMNI HOTELS MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DYLAN BELTRAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

03/01/2022: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Certificate of Counsel.

03/01/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

03/01/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/01/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

03/02/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

03/02/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/02/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220302-02136.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/02/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220302-02136.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 04/30/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: BRANDON GODFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: BRANDON GODFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: BRANDON GODFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: BRANDON GODFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of BRANDON GODFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OMNI HOTELS MANAGEMENT CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant