This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/08/2021 at 08:47:50 (UTC).

GAYHEART vs GARVEY

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 GAYHEART filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GARVEY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Raquel A. Marquez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0527

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Raquel A. Marquez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DINGUS GAYHEART

ROGER WHITE

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

TEXTRON, INC.

?GCGI PARTNERS, INC.

THE GOLF CLUB AT RANCHO CALIFORNIA

EZGO

JAMES GARVEY

SEY JUNG

GCGI PARTNERS, INC.

E-Z-GO DIVISION OF TEXTRON INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Fred Sahhar

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Catherine Ann Gayer

Catherine Ann Gayer Larry Dean Peterson

Robert Thomas Mackey

Peter Andrew Dubrawski

Cross Defendant Attorney

Larry Dean Peterson

 

Court Documents

Notice of Document Return.

06/25/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Demand for Jury Trial

06/03/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

05/14/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Summons Issued and Filed

05/10/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Association of Counsel on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DINGUS GAYHEART

04/30/2021: Association of Counsel on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DINGUS GAYHEART

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DINGUS GAYHEART

04/20/2021: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DINGUS GAYHEART

Demand for Jury Trial

04/20/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees

04/20/2021: Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees

Cross-Complaint

04/20/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

04/20/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DINGUS GAYHEART

04/16/2021: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DINGUS GAYHEART

Cross-Complaint

04/16/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

04/16/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DINGUS GAYHEART

04/12/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DINGUS GAYHEART

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DINGUS GAYHEART

04/01/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DINGUS GAYHEART

Notice of Department Assignment

01/28/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Statement of Damages (CIV-050)

01/19/2021: Statement of Damages (CIV-050)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Raquel A. Marquez; Location/Courtroom: Department S303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Demand for Jury Trial; Filed By: JAMES GARVEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on Cross-Complaint of GCGI PARTNERS, INC.; Filed By: JAMES GARVEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/14/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *4850 Receipt No.: 20210514-00467.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Posting Jury Fees.; Filed By: GCGI PARTNERS, INC.; SEY JUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/11/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *4850 Receipt No.: 20210511-00119.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/11/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *4850 Receipt No.: 20210511-00119.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: GCGI PARTNERS, INC.; SEY JUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Cross-Complaint; Filed By: GCGI PARTNERS, INC.; SEY JUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/28/2021; Fine Description: Check #002338 Receipt No.: 20210128-00676.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Statement of Damages (CIV-050)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Statement of Damages (CIV-050)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: DINGUS GAYHEART; ROGER WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: DINGUS GAYHEART; ROGER WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: DINGUS GAYHEART; ROGER WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: DINGUS GAYHEART; ROGER WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DINGUS GAYHEART

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE GOLF CLUB AT RANCHO CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where TEXTRON, INCORPORATED, d/b/a Lycoming Engines is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Catherine A. Gayer