This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 04/14/2023 at 11:50:12 (UTC).

GARDNER vs FLOREA

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 GARDNER filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against FLOREA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kira L. Klatchko. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4007

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kira L. Klatchko

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

GAIL A. GARDNER

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE CROSS-COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S TITLE THERETO

Defendants

CHEREEN FLOREA

NANETTE CHEFFERS

THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF JOHN E. GUSTAVSEN

THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF PATSY N. GUSTAVSEN, DECEASED

AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY THROUGH, OR UNDER JOHN E. GUSTAVEN

AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY, THROUGH, OR UNDER PATSY N. GUSTAVSEN

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

NANETTE CHEFFERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

AARON GARCIA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Regis Andrew Guerin

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to complete private mediation

04/12/2023: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to complete private mediation

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file Trial Setting Declaration

04/12/2023: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file Trial Setting Declaration

Minute Order: Case Management Conference

04/12/2023: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

Minute Order: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service as to DEFENDANT(S)

04/12/2023: Minute Order: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service as to DEFENDANT(S)

Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GAIL A. GARDNER

04/11/2023: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GAIL A. GARDNER

Stipulation For Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR) on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GAIL A. GARDNER

04/03/2023: Stipulation For Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR) on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GAIL A. GARDNER

Declaration of Aaron F. Garcia Regarding Order to Show Cause for Failure to File Proof of Service

04/05/2023: Declaration of Aaron F. Garcia Regarding Order to Show Cause for Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GAIL A. GARDNER

04/03/2023: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GAIL A. GARDNER

Proof of Publication on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GAIL A. GARDNER

04/03/2023: Proof of Publication on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GAIL A. GARDNER

Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GAIL A. GARDNER

04/03/2023: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GAIL A. GARDNER

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GAIL A. GARDNER

03/27/2023: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GAIL A. GARDNER

Verified Answer of Cross-Defendant Gail A. Gardner on Cross-Complaint of NANETTE CHEFFERS

02/07/2023: Verified Answer of Cross-Defendant Gail A. Gardner on Cross-Complaint of NANETTE CHEFFERS

Verified Cross-Complaint of Nanette Cheffers, as Trustee for: Quiet Title; Breach of Contract; Declaratory Relief

01/06/2023: Verified Cross-Complaint of Nanette Cheffers, as Trustee for: Quiet Title; Breach of Contract; Declaratory Relief

Verified Answer of Chereen Florea and Nanette Cheffers on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GAIL A. GARDNER

01/10/2023: Verified Answer of Chereen Florea and Nanette Cheffers on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GAIL A. GARDNER

Notice of Document Return.

01/10/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Change of Firm Address on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GAIL A. GARDNER

12/28/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Address on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GAIL A. GARDNER

Declaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension pursuant to CCP 430.41 on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GAIL A. GARDNER

12/23/2022: Declaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension pursuant to CCP 430.41 on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GAIL A. GARDNER

Application for Order for Publication of Summons on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GAIL A. GARDNER

12/29/2022: Application for Order for Publication of Summons on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GAIL A. GARDNER

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2023
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to complete private mediation as to AARON GARCIA, GAIL A. GARDNER, CHEREEN FLOREA, NANETTE CHEFFERS, Regis Andrew Guerin; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file Trial Setting Declaration as to AARON GARCIA, Regis Andrew Guerin; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service as to DEFENDANT(S); Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Held - Pre-disposition OSC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to complete private mediation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file Trial Setting Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service as to DEFENDANT(S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/11/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230411-00100.1; Paid: $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GAIL A. GARDNER; Filed By: GAIL A. GARDNER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/14/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221014-00371.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/14/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221014-00371.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000); Filed By: GAIL A. GARDNER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: GAIL A. GARDNER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: GAIL A. GARDNER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: GAIL A. GARDNER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GAIL A. GARDNER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less