This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/29/2021 at 10:36:19 (UTC).

GARCIA vs SALES PARTNERSHIP INCORPORATED

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 GARCIA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SALES PARTNERSHIP INCORPORATED. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sunshine Sykes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2062

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sunshine Sykes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAURA VAZQUEZ GARCIA

Defendant

SALES PARTNERSHIP INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rick Anthony Waltman

Defendant Attorney

Saundra K. Wootton

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued and Filed

05/03/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

05/03/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010)

05/03/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010)

REPRESENATATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT

05/03/2021: REPRESENATATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT

Notice of Department Assignment

05/07/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

05/07/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of LAURA VAZQUEZ GARCIA

05/17/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of LAURA VAZQUEZ GARCIA

Defendants Notice of Removal to Federal Court

06/15/2021: Defendants Notice of Removal to Federal Court

1st Amended Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of LAURA VAZQUEZ GARCIA

06/14/2021: 1st Amended Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of LAURA VAZQUEZ GARCIA

Declaration of RICK A. WALTMAN DECLARATION UNDER LOCAL RULE 3135 REGARDING MATERIAL PLEADINGS AND ORDERS UPON REMAND FROM FEDERAL COURT

10/08/2021: Declaration of RICK A. WALTMAN DECLARATION UNDER LOCAL RULE 3135 REGARDING MATERIAL PLEADINGS AND ORDERS UPON REMAND FROM FEDERAL COURT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of RICK A. WALTMAN DECLARATION UNDER LOCAL RULE 3135 REGARDING MATERIAL PLEADINGS AND ORDERS UPON REMAND FROM FEDERAL COURT; Filed By: LAURA VAZQUEZ GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference - Complex; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendants Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed By: SALES PARTNERSHIP INCORPORATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: 1st Amended Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of LAURA VAZQUEZ GARCIA; Filed By: LAURA VAZQUEZ GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketFilings: 1st Amended Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of LAURA VAZQUEZ GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of LAURA VAZQUEZ GARCIA; Filed By: LAURA VAZQUEZ GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Additional fee for case designated as complex - Plaintiff (GC70616A); Amount: $1,000.00; Paid: $1,000.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/07/2021; Fine Description: Check #D4003575 Receipt No.: 20210507-00248.1; Paid: $1,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/07/2021; Fine Description: Check #D4003575 Receipt No.: 20210507-00248.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: LAURA VAZQUEZ GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: LAURA VAZQUEZ GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010); Filed By: LAURA VAZQUEZ GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: REPRESENATATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT; Filed By: LAURA VAZQUEZ GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less