This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/14/2022 at 02:56:59 (UTC).

GARCIA vs ALL COUNTY ENVIRONMENTAL & RESTORATION, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 GARCIA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ALL COUNTY ENVIRONMENTAL RESTORATION, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0272

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DONALDO M. GARCIA

Defendant

ALL COUNTY ENVIRONMENTAL & RESTORATION, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL SCOTT BARTH

 

Court Documents

Class Action Complaint for Damages and Restitution

01/20/2022: Class Action Complaint for Damages and Restitution

Summons Issued and Filed

01/20/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010)

01/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010)

Certificate of Counsel.

01/20/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference

01/21/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

01/21/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

1st Amended Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of DONALDO M. GARCIA

02/04/2022: 1st Amended Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of DONALDO M. GARCIA

Notice of Document Return.

02/08/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Summons Issued and Filed

02/08/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference - Complex; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/10/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220210-02134.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/08/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220208-01315.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: DONALDO M. GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: 1st Amended Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of DONALDO M. GARCIA; Filed By: DONALDO M. GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketFilings: 1st Amended Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of DONALDO M. GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Additional fee for case designated as complex - Plaintiff (GC70616A); Amount: $1,000.00; Paid: $1,000.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/21/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220121-00421.1; Paid: $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/21/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220121-00421.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/21/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220121-00421.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 03/21/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: DONALDO M. GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010); Filed By: DONALDO M. GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: DONALDO M. GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Class Action Complaint for Damages and Restitution; Filed By: DONALDO M. GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL COUNTY ENVIORNMENTAL & RESTORATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARTH MICHAEL SCOTT