This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 05/19/2023 at 23:12:10 (UTC).

GALLEGOS vs OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 GALLEGOS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is O.G. Magno. The case status is Not Yet Classified.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5095

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

O.G. Magno

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAM GALLEGOS

Defendants

OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC

IFIT INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAMER HABBAS

Defendant Attorneys

JOHN S. WILLIAMSON

BRADLEY ROBERT MATHEWS

 

Court Documents

Minute Order: Case Management Conference

11/15/2023: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

05/19/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

Notice of Court Ordered Mediation

05/19/2023: Notice of Court Ordered Mediation

Certificate of Mailing

05/19/2023: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

05/19/2023: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM GALLEGOS

05/05/2023: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM GALLEGOS

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM GALLEGOS

05/05/2023: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM GALLEGOS

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM GALLEGOS

05/05/2023: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM GALLEGOS

Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Jury Fees on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM GALLEGOS

05/05/2023: Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Jury Fees on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM GALLEGOS

Plaintiff's Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM GALLEGOS

05/05/2023: Plaintiff's Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM GALLEGOS

Answer to Complaint by Defendant, Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM GALLEGOS

02/07/2023: Answer to Complaint by Defendant, Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM GALLEGOS

Defendant iFit Inc.'s Notice of Postin Jury Fees on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM GALLEGOS

02/03/2023: Defendant iFit Inc.'s Notice of Postin Jury Fees on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM GALLEGOS

Defendant iFit Inc.'s Answer to Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM GALLEGOS

02/03/2023: Defendant iFit Inc.'s Answer to Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM GALLEGOS

Notice of Document Return.

01/20/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM GALLEGOS

01/18/2023: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM GALLEGOS

Notice of Department Assignment

11/23/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

11/23/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

Summons Issued and Filed

11/22/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: O.G. Magno; Location/Courtroom: Department 7; Disposition: Hearing Off-Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: O.G. Magno; Location/Courtroom: Department 7; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: O.G. Magno; Location/Courtroom: Department 7; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Mediation Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement Due; Expiration Date: 09/28/2023; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Response to Notice of Court Ordered Mediation Due; Expiration Date: 06/12/2023; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Court Ordered Mediation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM GALLEGOS; Filed By: WILLIAM GALLEGOS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/23/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221123-01342.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/23/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221123-01342.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000); Filed By: WILLIAM GALLEGOS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM GALLEGOS; Filed By: WILLIAM GALLEGOS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: WILLIAM GALLEGOS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: WILLIAM GALLEGOS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM GALLEGOS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less