This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 22:01:24 (UTC).

FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. vs SOLOMON ENGINEERING

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOLOMON ENGINEERING. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3887

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC

Defendant

SOLOMON ENGINEERING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIAMOND & DRAGOJEVIC, LLP

Attorney at DIAMOND & DRAGOJEVIC, LLP

Defendant Attorney

Margaret Na Young Eum

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

07/22/2021: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

07/22/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

07/22/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

07/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

07/28/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

08/04/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

09/09/2021: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/17/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *0958 Receipt No.: 20210917-00232.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/17/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *0958 Receipt No.: 20210917-00232.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.; Filed By: SOLOMON ENGINEERING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.; Filed By: FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/28/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210728-00314.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOLOMON ENGINEERING is a litigant

Latest cases where FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eum, Margaret N