This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/09/2023 at 09:11:38 (UTC).

FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. vs COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

Case Summary

On 12/08/2022 FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Harold W. Hopp. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5317

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Harold W. Hopp

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC

Defendants

COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

CALIFORNIA STATE BOARD OF EQUALIZATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETER WILLIAM MICHAELS

Defendant Attorney

Margaret R. Prinzing

 

Court Documents

Notice of Document Return.

01/27/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Stipulation for Stay of Litigation and Order

01/27/2023: Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Stipulation for Stay of Litigation and Order

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Judicial Review (Over $25,000) of FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

01/26/2023: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Judicial Review (Over $25,000) of FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

Proof of Service of Stipulation for Stay of Litigation and [Proposed] Order on Complaint for Other Judicial Review (Over $25,000) of FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

01/23/2023: Proof of Service of Stipulation for Stay of Litigation and [Proposed] Order on Complaint for Other Judicial Review (Over $25,000) of FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

Stipulation for Stay of Litigation and Order on Complaint for Other Judicial Review (Over $25,000) of FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

01/27/2023: Stipulation for Stay of Litigation and Order on Complaint for Other Judicial Review (Over $25,000) of FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

Proof of Service of Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Judicial Review (Over $25,000) of FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

01/23/2023: Proof of Service of Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Judicial Review (Over $25,000) of FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Judicial Review (Over $25,000) of FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

01/23/2023: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Judicial Review (Over $25,000) of FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

Proof of Service Summons on Complaint for Other Judicial Review (Over $25,000) of FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

01/20/2023: Proof of Service Summons on Complaint for Other Judicial Review (Over $25,000) of FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

Notice of Document Return.

01/23/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Class Action Case Management Order #1

12/13/2022: Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Class Action Case Management Order #1

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint for Other Judicial Review (Over $25,000) of FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

12/13/2022: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint for Other Judicial Review (Over $25,000) of FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

Class Action Case Management Order #1

12/13/2022: Class Action Case Management Order #1

Notice of Department Assignment

12/09/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Judicial Review (Over $25,000)

12/09/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Judicial Review (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010)

12/08/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010)

Certificate of Counsel.

12/08/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

12/08/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Verified Complaint for Property Tax Refund and Declaratory Judgment

12/08/2022: Verified Complaint for Property Tax Refund and Declaratory Judgment

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference - Complex; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference - Complex; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • HearingType: Court Ruling re: Stipulation for Stay of Litigation and Order; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Stipulation for Stay of Litigation and Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Stipulation for Stay of Litigation and Order on Complaint for Other Judicial Review (Over $25,000) of FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.; Filed By: COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/26/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230126-01519.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Judicial Review (Over $25,000) of FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.; Filed By: FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Additional fee for case designated as complex - Defendant (GC70616B); Amount: $1,000.00; Paid: $1,000.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/25/2023; Fine Description: Exempt Receipt No.: EFM20230125-00610.1; Paid: $1,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/25/2023; Fine Description: Exempt Receipt No.: EFM20230125-00610.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/09/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221209-01807.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Additional fee for case designated as complex - Plaintiff (GC70616A); Amount: $1,000.00; Paid: $1,000.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/09/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221209-01807.1; Paid: $1,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/09/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221209-01807.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Judicial Review (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010); Filed By: FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Verified Complaint for Property Tax Refund and Declaratory Judgment; Filed By: FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Judicial Review (Over $25,000) of FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less